EP3156624 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A SLOWLY RUNNING LARGE DIESEL ENGINE, AND SLOWLY RUNNING LARGE DIESEL ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Winterthur Gas & Diesel AG Schützenstrasse 1-3 8401 Winterthur / CH | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kishore, Nanda Sangram Im oberen Gern 19 CH-8409 Winterthur / IN | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | IPS Irsch AG Langfeldstrasse 88 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Intellectual Property Services GmbH Langfeldstrasse 88 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | Application number, filing date | 16190354.7 | 23.09.2016 | [2017/16] | Priority number, date | EP20150190160 | 16.10.2015 Original published format: EP 15190160 | [2017/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3156624 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01N13/00 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
F01N13/008 (EP);
F02B37/12 (KR);
F02D41/0085 (CN);
F02B25/02 (KR);
F02B33/02 (KR);
F02B75/02 (KR);
F02D41/027 (CN);
F02D41/1443 (EP);
F02D41/1454 (EP);
F01N13/10 (EP);
F01N2590/02 (EP);
F02B2075/025 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] |
Former [2017/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES LANGSAM LAUFENDEN GROSSDIESELMOTORS, SOWIE LANGSAM LAUFENDER GROSSDIESELMOTOR | [2017/16] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A SLOWLY RUNNING LARGE DIESEL ENGINE, AND SLOWLY RUNNING LARGE DIESEL ENGINE | [2017/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN GROS MOTEUR DIESEL LENT ET GROS MOTEUR DIESEL LENT | [2017/16] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 17.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/17] | 17.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/17] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 17.01.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 17.01.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.02.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2112349 (WAERTSILAE SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,6,10-15 * paragraphs [0027] , [0029] , [0032] , [0041] , [0044] , [0045]; figures 1,2 * [I] 3-5,7-9; | [XI]KR20090111272 [X] 1,2,6,10-14 * paragraphs [0027] , [0029] , [0032] , [0041] , [0044] , [0045]; figure 1 * [I] 3-5,7-9; | [XI]WO2015108144 (IHI CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6,10-15 * abstract * [I] 3,4,7-9; | EP3098415 [ ] (IHI CORP [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0011] , [0013] , [0061] - [0063] *; | [I]WO2015086898 (LANGH TECH AB OY [FI]) [I] 1,14 * paragraph [0016]; figure 2 *; | [I]US8696777 (PATIL SUNIL K R [US], et al) [I] 1,14 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE102008025671 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * |