EP3300663 - SAMPLING DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR COLLECTING A SAMPLE OF A BODY FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diabetes Care GmbH Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2018/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEICHNER, Wilhelm Zwerchgasse 7 68307 Mannheim / DE | [2018/14] | Representative(s) | Pfiz, Thomas, et al Pfiz/Gauss Patentanwälte PartmbB Tübinger Strasse 26 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/14] | Application number, filing date | 16191038.5 | 28.09.2016 | [2018/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3300663 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3300663 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/145, A61B5/1477, A61B5/157, A61B5/15, A61B5/151 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/157 (US);
A61B5/14532 (US);
A61B5/1477 (US);
A61B5/150358 (EP,US);
A61B5/150419 (EP,US);
A61B5/15045 (EP,US);
A61B5/150519 (EP,US);
A61B5/15107 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/14] | A61B5/15, A61B5/151 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] |
Former [2018/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PROBENAHMEVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR ENTNAHME EINER KÖRPERFLÜSSIGKEIT | [2018/14] | English: | SAMPLING DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR COLLECTING A SAMPLE OF A BODY FLUID | [2018/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCHANTILLONNAGE ET SYSTÈME DE COLLECTE D'UN ÉCHANTILLON D'UN FLUIDE CORPOREL | [2019/28] |
Former [2018/14] | DISPOSITIF D'ECHANTILLONNAGE ET SYSTEME DE COLLECTE D'UN ECHANTILLON D'UN FLUIDE CORPOREL | Examination procedure | 04.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2018 | Examination requested [2018/46] | 04.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2016 | AL | 20.11.2019 | AT | 20.11.2019 | CY | 20.11.2019 | CZ | 20.11.2019 | DK | 20.11.2019 | EE | 20.11.2019 | ES | 20.11.2019 | FI | 20.11.2019 | HR | 20.11.2019 | LT | 20.11.2019 | LV | 20.11.2019 | MC | 20.11.2019 | MK | 20.11.2019 | MT | 20.11.2019 | NL | 20.11.2019 | PL | 20.11.2019 | RO | 20.11.2019 | RS | 20.11.2019 | SE | 20.11.2019 | SI | 20.11.2019 | SK | 20.11.2019 | SM | 20.11.2019 | TR | 20.11.2019 | BG | 20.02.2020 | NO | 20.02.2020 | GR | 21.02.2020 | IS | 20.03.2020 | PT | 12.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 28.09.2016 | |
AL | 20.11.2019 | ||
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CY | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
MT | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
TR | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.09.2016 | |
AL | 20.11.2019 | ||
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CY | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MT | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
TR | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 20.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1518509 (DIABETES DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] * * figures 1-9D *; | [A]US2006167382 (DESHMUKH AJAY [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0040] *; | [IA]WO2008145625 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-6,8-10,12-15 * page 15, line 30 - page 16, line 34 * * figure - * [A] 7,11; | [XAI]EP2030566 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,5-9,13-15 * paragraphs [0052] , [0053]; figure - * [A] 10-12 [I] 2,4; | [XI]US2011077554 (ROE STEVEN N [US], et al) [X] 1,3-15 * paragraphs [0103] , [0104] , [0109] * * figures 1,3,6-9,11,13,14,54,55,67-69 * [I] 2 | by applicant | EP1671585 | WO2012126945 |