EP3150898 - METHOD FOR AUTOMATED CONTROL OF A MACHINE COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B&R Industrial Automation GmbH B & R Strasse 1 5142 Eggelsberg / AT | [2017/48] |
Former [2017/14] | For all designated states Bernecker+Rainer Industrie-Elektronik Gesellschaft MbH B & R Strasse 1 5142 Eggelsberg / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaufleitner, Franz Dorfen 23 5122 Hochburg-Ach / AT | 02 /
Veselic, Miodrag Drevesstrasse 4 6800 Feldkirch / AT | 03 /
Burgstaller, Walter Innerwall 5 5164 Seeham / AT | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Pinter & Weiss OG Prinz-Eugen-Straße 70 1040 Wien / AT | [2017/14] | Application number, filing date | 16191356.1 | 29.09.2016 | [2017/14] | Priority number, date | AT20150050835 | 01.10.2015 Original published format: AT 508352015 | [2017/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3150898 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3150898 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/35] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3150898 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16P3/14, G06K9/00 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
F16P3/144 (EP,AT,US);
G06F18/00 (AT);
G05B19/0428 (US);
F16P3/14 (AT);
G01V8/20 (AT);
G05B11/011 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] |
Former [2017/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISIERTEN STEUERUNG EINER MASCHINENKOMPONENTE | [2017/14] | English: | METHOD FOR AUTOMATED CONTROL OF A MACHINE COMPONENT | [2017/14] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE AUTOMATISEE D'UN COMPOSANT DE MACHINE | [2017/14] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 07.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.05.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.05.2022
18.05.2022
ADMISSIBLE SICK AG Postfach 3 10 79177 Waldkirch / DE Opponent's representative Rieger, Daniel-Stephan Sick AG Intellectual Property Erwin-Sick-Straße 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2022/25] | 16.06.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.10.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.10.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.11.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.11.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.03.2024 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2016 | AL | 01.09.2021 | CY | 01.09.2021 | CZ | 01.09.2021 | DK | 01.09.2021 | EE | 01.09.2021 | ES | 01.09.2021 | FI | 01.09.2021 | HR | 01.09.2021 | LT | 01.09.2021 | LV | 01.09.2021 | MC | 01.09.2021 | MK | 01.09.2021 | NL | 01.09.2021 | PL | 01.09.2021 | RO | 01.09.2021 | RS | 01.09.2021 | SE | 01.09.2021 | SI | 01.09.2021 | SK | 01.09.2021 | SM | 01.09.2021 | TR | 01.09.2021 | IE | 29.09.2021 | LU | 29.09.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | BG | 01.12.2021 | NO | 01.12.2021 | GR | 02.12.2021 | IS | 01.01.2022 | PT | 03.01.2022 | AT | 29.09.2022 | GB | 29.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 29.09.2016 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
MK | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 29.09.2021 | ||
LU | 29.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
AT | 29.09.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | HU | 29.09.2016 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 29.09.2021 | ||
LU | 29.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
AT | 29.09.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HU | 29.09.2016 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 29.09.2021 | ||
LU | 29.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
AT | 29.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 29.09.2016 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 29.09.2021 | ||
LU | 29.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 29.09.2016 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 29.09.2021 | ||
LU | 29.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 29.09.2021 | ||
LU | 29.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 29.09.2021 | ||
LU | 29.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
LU | 29.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 01.09.2021 | |
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 01.09.2021 | |
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 01.09.2021 | |
NO | 01.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10224031 (LEUZE LUMIFLEX GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * Paragraphen: : [0036]-[0047], [0053], [0057]-[0058] ** figure 1 *; | [Y]US2005205763 (BECK MICHAEL [DE], et al) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * Paragraphen: : [0015], [0020], [0034]-[0042] * * figures 1, 2, 3 *; | [X]WO2014202471 (PILZ GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * Paragraphen: [0054]-[0055]; [0059], erster Satz; [0060]; [0062], zweiter Satz; [0064]-[0065] * * figures 1, 2, 3 *; | [Y] - Anonymous, "Feldbus - Wikipedia", (20150604), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20150604073452/https://de.wikipedia.org/wiki/Feldbus, (20170210), XP055344556 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1443343 | Opposition | DE19742716 | DE19939567 | DE10224031 | EP1443343 | US2005205763 | EP1876383 | WO2014202471 | - Anonymous, "Feldbus - Wikipedia", (20150604), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20150604073452/https://de.wikipedia.org/wiki/Feldbus, (20170210), XP055344556 |