EP3301316 - ROTARY CONNECTION, BUSHING FOR ROTARY CONNECTION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A ROTARY CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fischer Engineering Solutions AG Ernst Fischer-Weg 5 3360 Herzogenbuchsee / CH | [2018/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stieger, Werner Schlossstrassse 68 4702 Oensingen / CH | 02 /
Boller, Rolf Margarethenstrasse 6 4450 Sissach / CH | 03 /
Hager, Simon Muesmattstrasse 34 3012 Bern / CH | [2018/14] | Representative(s) | Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [2018/14] | Application number, filing date | 16191411.4 | 29.09.2016 | [2018/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3301316 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16C35/073, F16D1/08 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
F16D1/0835 (EP);
F16C35/073 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTATIONSVERBINDUNG, SPANNHÜLSE FÜR ROTATIONSVERBINDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER ROTATIONSVERBINDUNG | [2018/14] | English: | ROTARY CONNECTION, BUSHING FOR ROTARY CONNECTION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A ROTARY CONNECTION | [2018/14] | French: | JONCTION ROTATIVE, DOUILLE DE SERRAGE POUR LA JONCTION ROTATIVE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE JONCTION ROTATIVE | [2018/14] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/15] | 13.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US3146635 (BROSE HARLAN F) [X] 1,2,8-10,13,15 * column 1, line 9 - line 55 * * column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 3; figures 1,2,4 * [Y] 5-7,11,12,14 [I] 3,4; | [Y]US4856970 (ODA ISAO [JP], et al) [Y] 5,6 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 17 * * column 4, line 61 - line 66; figure - *; | [Y]US2012201682 (DYMOND NIGEL YOUATT [GB], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0039]; figure -; claim 1 *; | [Y]US5427450 (GAMBRILL JEFFREY S [US]) [Y] 12 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 17; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4981390 (CRAMER JR ARTHUR A [US], et al) [Y] 11,14 * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 24; figures 15-20 *; | [AD]DE2834834 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [AD] 1-15 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 2; figures 2c,3,4a,4b * | by applicant | DE2834834 |