EP3208514 - LIGHT BULB USING LED FILAMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BGT Materials Limited 2.312 Photon Science Institute University of Manchester Oxford Road Manchester M13 9PL / GB | [2017/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAI, CHUNG-PING No. 19, I Chin New Village, Zhubei City, Hsinchu County 302 302 ZHUBEI CITY / TW | [2017/34] | Representative(s) | Brown, Michael Stanley Alpha & Omega Chine Croft East Hill Ottery St. Mary, Devon EX11 1PJ / GB | [2017/34] | Application number, filing date | 16191507.9 | 29.09.2016 | [2017/34] | Priority number, date | GB20160003000 | 22.02.2016 Original published format: GB 201603000 | [2017/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3208514 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3208514 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F21K9/232, // H01L33/64, H01L33/62, F21Y115/10 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
F21K9/232 (EP);
F21K9/23 (GB);
F21V29/86 (GB);
F21Y2115/10 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L2224/48137 (EP);
H01L2224/73265 (EP);
H01L2924/181 (EP);
H01L33/62 (EP);
H01L33/641 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (EP) |
Former IPC [2017/34] | F21K9/232, // H01L33/64, H01L33/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] | Title | German: | GLÜHLAMPE MIT LED-LEUCHTDRAHT | [2017/34] | English: | LIGHT BULB USING LED FILAMENT | [2017/34] | French: | AMPOULE ÉLECTRIQUE UTILISANT UN FILAMENT DE DEL | [2017/34] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 25.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2016 | AL | 31.01.2018 | CY | 31.01.2018 | EE | 31.01.2018 | FI | 31.01.2018 | HR | 31.01.2018 | LT | 31.01.2018 | LV | 31.01.2018 | MC | 31.01.2018 | MK | 31.01.2018 | NL | 31.01.2018 | RO | 31.01.2018 | RS | 31.01.2018 | SE | 31.01.2018 | SK | 31.01.2018 | SM | 31.01.2018 | TR | 31.01.2018 | BG | 30.04.2018 | NO | 30.04.2018 | GR | 01.05.2018 | IS | 31.05.2018 | IE | 29.09.2018 | LU | 29.09.2018 | MT | 29.09.2018 | SI | 29.09.2018 | [2021/01] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 29.09.2016 | |
AL | 31.01.2018 | ||
CY | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
MK | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 29.09.2018 | ||
LU | 29.09.2018 | ||
MT | 29.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 29.09.2016 | |
AL | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 29.09.2018 | ||
LU | 29.09.2018 | ||
MT | 29.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 29.09.2018 | ||
LU | 29.09.2018 | ||
MT | 29.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 29.09.2018 | ||
LU | 29.09.2018 | ||
MT | 29.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 29.09.2018 | ||
LU | 29.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN203848212U (QUANZHOU JINTAIYANG LIGHTING TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-9* paragraphs [0004] - [0011] *; | [A]US2014375201 (SU HWA [TW], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [041 ] - [0 43]; figures 7a, 7b *; | [A]CN104406068 (NINGBO YUSING ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] - [0072]; figures 1-12 *; | [A]CN104989981 (XIAMEN LISHI BROTHER CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] * |