EP3301624 - BAGGAGE HANDLING SYSTEM FOR MAKING A SORTING DECISION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Logistics GmbH Fürther Strasse 254 90429 Nürnberg / DE | [2023/13] |
Former [2018/14] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUECK, Dr. Bengt Heinrich-Röhr-Str. 59 32760 Detmold / DE | 02 /
PASHOV, Dr. Ilian Riedstrasse 3 78467 Konstanz / DE | 03 /
ROTTLAND, Dr. Jörg Dettelbachstr. 14 78315 Radolfzell / DE | 04 /
ZISCH, Rainer Wolfermoosstrasse 11 78337 Öhningen / DE | [2018/14] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/14] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16191694.5 | 30.09.2016 | [2018/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3301624 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/08, G06Q50/28, B64F1/36 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
G06Q10/08 (EP);
B64F1/368 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] |
Former [2018/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAGGAGE-HANDLING-SYSTEM ZUM TREFFEN EINER SORTIERENTSCHEIDUNG | [2018/14] | English: | BAGGAGE HANDLING SYSTEM FOR MAKING A SORTING DECISION | [2018/14] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MANUTENTION DE BAGAGE POUR EFFECTUER UN TRI | [2018/14] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 22.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.02.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/22] | 19.03.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/22] | Appeal following examination | 16.03.2021 | Appeal received No. T0780/21 | 16.03.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 03.06.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.03.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 24.04.2024 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 19.03.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2010067132 (DIRECT RADIO RESPONSE LTD [GB], et al); | [I]US2016075449 (ZIEGLER ROLAND [DE]) |