EP3199164 - PROCESSES FOR MAKING LACTOSE UTILIZING PRE-CLASSIFICATION TECHNIQUES AND PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS FORMED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | For all designated states DMV-Fonterra Excipients Technology GmbH Klever Strasse 187 47574 Goch / DE | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEWMAN, Stephen c/o GlaxoSmithKline Park Road Ware, Hertfordshire SG12 0DP / GB | 02 /
DAMHUIS, Rudolf Johanus c/o Friesland Foods Domo Needsweg 23 7271 AB Borculo / NL | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/31] | Shore, Andrew David GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 16191843.8 | 06.02.2006 | [2017/31] | Priority number, date | US20050651755P | 10.02.2005 Original published format: US 651755 P | [2017/31] | Previously filed application, date | WO2006US04032 | 06.02.2006 | [2017/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3199164 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3199164 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7016, A61K31/715, C07H3/00, C13K5/00, A61K9/00 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
C13K5/00 (EP,US);
A61K9/20 (KR);
A61K31/7016 (EP,US);
A61K31/715 (EP,US);
A61K47/36 (KR);
A61K9/0075 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/31] | Extension states | HR | 30.09.2016 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LACTOSE UNTER VERWENDUNG VON VORKLASSIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN SOWIE DAMIT ERZEUGTE PHARMAZEUTISCHE FORMULIERUNGEN | [2017/31] | English: | PROCESSES FOR MAKING LACTOSE UTILIZING PRE-CLASSIFICATION TECHNIQUES AND PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS FORMED THEREFROM | [2017/31] | French: | PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DU LACTOSE AU MOYEN DE TECHNIQUES DE PRE-CLASSIFICATION ET PREPARATIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES AINSI OBTENUES | [2017/31] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 30.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06734392.1 / EP1848444 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.12.2020
14.01.2021
ADMISSIBLE Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB Opponent's representative Adamson Jones Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.12.2020
14.01.2021
ADMISSIBLE Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB Opponent's representative Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | ||
Former [2021/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.12.2020
Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB Opponent's representative Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | 21.01.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.05.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.01.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.03.2022 | 10.02.2022 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 20.02.2022 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2022/26] | 09.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.02.2006 | AT | 18.03.2020 | CY | 18.03.2020 | CZ | 18.03.2020 | DK | 18.03.2020 | EE | 18.03.2020 | ES | 18.03.2020 | FI | 18.03.2020 | IT | 18.03.2020 | LT | 18.03.2020 | LV | 18.03.2020 | MC | 18.03.2020 | NL | 18.03.2020 | PL | 18.03.2020 | RO | 18.03.2020 | SE | 18.03.2020 | SI | 18.03.2020 | SK | 18.03.2020 | TR | 18.03.2020 | BG | 18.06.2020 | GR | 19.06.2020 | IS | 18.07.2020 | PT | 12.08.2020 | IE | 06.02.2021 | LU | 06.02.2021 | BE | 28.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 06.02.2006 | |
AT | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 06.02.2021 | ||
LU | 06.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 06.02.2021 | ||
LU | 06.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 06.02.2021 | ||
LU | 06.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 06.02.2021 | ||
LU | 06.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 06.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 18.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9623485 (CO ORDINATED DRUG DEV [GB], et al) [X] 1-15* examples 3, 45 *; | [A]WO03088943 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 10 * | Examination | WO9511666 | WO0033811 | WO2004017914 | by applicant | GB2064336 | EP0069715 | GB2129691 | GB2169265 | GB2178965 | US4778054 | US4811731 | US5035237 | GB2242134 | US5590645 | US5860419 | US5873360 | US6032666 | US6143277 | US6170717 | US6253762 | US6315173 | US6318603 | US6321747 | US6360739 | US6378519 | US6390291 | US6431168 | US6511653 | US6532955 | US6536427 | US6546928 | - X. M. ZENG ET AL., INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, (1998), vol. 176, pages 99 - 110 | US20050651754 | Opposition | US3634582 | WO9511666 | US5478578 | WO9623485 | WO0033811 | WO03088943 | WO2004017914 | - Damhuis Rudie, Diepenmaat Paul, Te Wierik Henk, "Formulation of Lactose for Inhaled Delivery Systems", Pharmaceutical Technology Europe, (20021101), vol. 14, no. 11, XP093002131 |