EP3135193 - POSITION SENSING SYSTEM FOR ORTHOPAEDIC APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosense Webster, Inc. 3333 Diamond Canyon Road Diamond Bar, CA 91765 / US | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Assaf, Govari Vitzo 1 34400 Haifa / IL | 02 /
Shalgi, Avi 5 Hazohar Street Zichron Yaakov 3092677 / IL | 03 /
Pesach, Susel 32 Esther Rabin Street Haifa 3491793 / IL | 04 /
Reznick, David Peleg 33 Shimshit / IL | [2017/22] |
Former [2017/09] | 01 /
Assaf, Govari Vitzo 1 34400 Haifa / IL | ||
02 /
Shalgi, Avi Kashani 3 Tev-Aviv / IL | |||
03 /
Pesach, Susel Vardia 43 Haifa / IL | |||
04 /
Reznick, David Peleg 33 Shimshit / IL | Representative(s) | Alton, Andrew Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | Alton, Andrew Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 16192055.8 | 03.03.2005 | [2017/09] | Priority number, date | US20040550924P | 05.03.2004 Original published format: US 550924 P | US20050062258P | 18.02.2005 Original published format: US 62258 P | [2017/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3135193 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3135193 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/06 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
A61B90/36 (EP,US);
B01D21/0045 (KR);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
B01D21/06 (KR);
B01D21/183 (KR);
B01D21/2444 (KR);
C02F1/5209 (KR);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/40] |
Former [2017/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | POSITIONSMESSSYSTEM FÜR ORTHOPÄDISCHE ANWENDUNGEN | [2017/09] | English: | POSITION SENSING SYSTEM FOR ORTHOPAEDIC APPLICATIONS | [2017/09] | French: | SYSTEME DE DETECTION DE POSITION POUR APPLICATIONS ORTHOPEDIQUES | [2017/09] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 11.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05251287.8 / EP1570782 | Divisional application(s) | EP18172461.8 / EP3381363 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 03.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2005 | AT | 16.05.2018 | CY | 16.05.2018 | CZ | 16.05.2018 | DK | 16.05.2018 | EE | 16.05.2018 | ES | 16.05.2018 | FI | 16.05.2018 | LT | 16.05.2018 | MC | 16.05.2018 | PL | 16.05.2018 | RO | 16.05.2018 | SE | 16.05.2018 | SI | 16.05.2018 | SK | 16.05.2018 | TR | 16.05.2018 | BG | 16.08.2018 | GR | 17.08.2018 | IS | 16.09.2018 | PT | 17.09.2018 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/31] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IS | 16.09.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9729683 (BIOSENSE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 1, lines 7-10 * * page 4, lines 7-22 * * page 11, line 24 - page 14, line 28 * * page 18, line 21 - page 20, line 12; figures 1,2,6a,6b,710,11a,11b *; | [A]US6314310 (BEN-HAIM SHLOMO [IL], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 14, line 1 - column 15, line 12 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US6332089 (ACKER DAVID E [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 29 * * figures 5-10 *; | [A]US2002193685 (MATE TIMOTHY P [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] * * figures 1,2,10 *; | [A]EP1321097 (BIOSENSE INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0023] , [0050] , [0051] , [0053] , [0063] - [0066]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6618612 (ACKER DAVID E [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 62 - column 5, line 10 * * column 14, line 24 - line 32 * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2003192557 (KRAG DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0143] - paragraph [0150] ** figures 21,22 * |