EP3301478 - SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING A DISTANCE TO AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xenomatix NV Esperantolaan 4 3001 Leuven (Heverlee) / BE | [2018/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DYCK, Dirk Kleine Grippe 37 2630 Aartselaar / BE | 02 /
VAN DEN BOSSCHE, Johan Kortrijkstraat 116 3210 Linden / BE | [2018/14] | Representative(s) | Beck, Michaël Andries T. IPLodge Technologielaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/14] | Beck, Michaël Andries T. IPLodge bvba Technologielaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | Application number, filing date | 16192104.4 | 03.10.2016 | [2018/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3301478 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/10, G01S17/89, G01S17/93, G01S7/481, G01S7/486 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
G01S7/4815 (EP,US);
G01S17/10 (EP);
G01S17/18 (US);
G01S17/86 (US);
G01S17/894 (EP,US);
G01S17/931 (EP,US);
G01S7/4816 (EP);
G01S7/484 (US);
G01S7/4863 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER DISTANZ ZU EINEM OBJEKT | [2018/14] | English: | SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING A DISTANCE TO AN OBJECT | [2018/14] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE DISTANCE PAR RAPPORT À UN OBJET | [2018/14] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/14] | 13.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010231891 (MASE MITSUHITO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6* paragraphs [0093] - [0101] - [0129] - [0135] - [0198] - [0211] - [0125] - [0128] - [0069]; figures 6,9,10,24 *; | [Y]US2013148102 (OGGIER THIERRY [CH]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0016] - [0028] - [0014] , [0031] , [0033] , [0035] , [0039]; figures 1,2,5b,7 * | by applicant | US7544945 | EP2290402 | EP2322953 | US2012038903 | WO2015004213 | US2015063387 | - NEIL E. NEWMAN ET AL., "High Peak Power VCSELs in Short Range LIDAR Applications", JOURNAL OF UNDERGRADUATE RESEARCH IN PHYSICS, (2013), URL: http://www.jurp.org/2013/12017EXR.pdf, XP055337306 | - SHOJI KAWAHITO ET AL., "A CMOS Time-of-Flight Range Image Sensor With Gates-on-Field-Oxide Structure", IEEE SENSORS JOURNAL, vol. 7, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1109/JSEN.2007.907561, pages 1578 - 1586, XP011196172 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSEN.2007.907561 | EP20150191288 |