EP3170837 - EXPRESSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A. Rue de l'Institut, 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | [2017/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLAIS, Normand GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals Canada 525 Cartier Boulevard West Laval, Québec H7V 3S8 / CA | 02 /
DEHOTTAY, Philippe Marc Helene GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals s.a. Rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | 03 /
DEWERCHIN, Marianne GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals s.a. Rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | 04 /
GOFFIN, Philippe GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals s.a. Rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | 05 /
MARTIN, Denis GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals Canada 525 Cartier Boulevard West Laval, Québec H7V 3S8 / CA | [2017/21] | Representative(s) | Thornley, Rachel Mary GSK Legal & Compliance - Global Patents 79 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1DG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/21] | Thornley, Rachel Mary GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 16192258.8 | 07.10.2010 | [2017/21] | Priority number, date | GB20090017647 | 08.10.2009 Original published format: GB 0917647 | [2017/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3170837 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3170837 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3170837 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/34, C12N15/62 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
C07K14/34 (EP,US);
C12N15/62 (KR);
A61K39/02 (KR);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07K1/00 (US);
C07K14/195 (KR);
C12N15/63 (KR);
C12N9/1077 (EP,US);
C12Y204/02036 (EP,US);
C07K2319/034 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Extension states | BA | 04.10.2016 | ME | 04.10.2016 | Title | German: | EXPRESSIONSSYSTEM | [2017/21] | English: | EXPRESSION SYSTEM | [2017/21] | French: | SYSTÈME D'EXPRESSION | [2017/21] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 04.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10762693.9 / EP2486047 | Divisional application(s) | EP18167370.8 / EP3480209 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.10.2010 | AL | 21.08.2019 | AT | 21.08.2019 | CY | 21.08.2019 | CZ | 21.08.2019 | DK | 21.08.2019 | EE | 21.08.2019 | FI | 21.08.2019 | HR | 21.08.2019 | LT | 21.08.2019 | LV | 21.08.2019 | MC | 21.08.2019 | MK | 21.08.2019 | MT | 21.08.2019 | PL | 21.08.2019 | RO | 21.08.2019 | RS | 21.08.2019 | SE | 21.08.2019 | SI | 21.08.2019 | SK | 21.08.2019 | SM | 21.08.2019 | LU | 07.10.2019 | CH | 31.10.2019 | LI | 31.10.2019 | BG | 21.11.2019 | NO | 21.11.2019 | GR | 22.11.2019 | IS | 21.12.2019 | PT | 23.12.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 07.10.2010 | |
AL | 21.08.2019 | ||
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
MT | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
LU | 07.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 07.10.2010 | |
AL | 21.08.2019 | ||
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
LU | 07.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
LU | 07.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
LU | 07.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
LU | 07.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
LU | 07.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 21.08.2019 | |
NO | 21.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9010015 (SERAGEN INC [US]) [X] 1-7,19,21-27 * page 12, lines 23-26 *; | [XD] - O'KEEFE D O ET AL, "CLONED DIPHTHERIA TOXIN WITHIN THE PERIPLASM OF ESCHERICHIA-COLI CAUSES LETHAL MEMBRANE DAMAGE AT LOW PH", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (1989), vol. 86, no. 1, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 343 - 346, XP002614714 [XD] 1-7,19,21-27 * abstract * * page 343, column l, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.86.1.343 | [AD] - BISHAI W R ET AL, "HIGH-LEVEL EXPRESSION OF A PROTEOLYTICALLY SENSITIVE DIPHTHERIA TOXIN FRAGMENT IN ESCHERICHIA-COLI", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (19871101), vol. 169, no. 11, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 5140 - 5151, XP002561433 [AD] 1-7,19,21-27 * abstract * * page 5141, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 1 * | [A] - HUMPHREYS D P ET AL, "High-Level Periplasmic Expression in Escherichia coli Using a Eukaryotic Signal Peptide: Importance of Codon Usage at the 5' End of the Coding Sequence", PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA, (20001101), vol. 20, no. 2, doi:10.1006/PREP.2000.1286, ISSN 1046-5928, pages 252 - 264, XP004435483 [A] 1-7,19,21-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/prep.2000.1286 | by applicant | US4235877 | US4365170 | EP0161188 | EP0208375 | US4673574 | US4709017 | US4950740 | EP0477508 | WO9315760 | WO9324148 | WO9508348 | WO9629094 | WO9700697 | US5601827 | WO9842721 | US5843711 | US5917017 | WO02055105 | - MOSKAUG ET AL., BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, pages 15709 - 15713 | - LINGOOD ET AL., BRIT.J. EXP. PATH., (1963), vol. 44, page 177 | - UCHIDA ET AL., NATURE NEW BIOLOGY, (1971), vol. 233, pages 8 - 11 | - PAPPENHEIMER, ANN REV, BIOCHEM., (1977), vol. 46, pages 69 - 94 | - RAPPUOLI, APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (198309), pages 560 - 564 | - BISHAI ET AL., J BACTERIOL., vol. 169, pages 5140 - 5151 | - O'KEEFE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., vol. 86, pages 343 - 346 | - BISHAI ET AL., J BACTERIOL, vol. 169, pages 5140 - 5151 | - CARILLO, H.; LIPMAN, D., SIAM J. APPLIED MATH., (1988), vol. 48, page 1073 | - DEVEREUX, J. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1984), vol. 12, no. 1, page 387 | - ALTSCHUL, S.F. ET AL., J. MOLEC. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 2444 - 2448 | - ALTSCHUL, S. ET AL., BLAST Manual, NCBI NLM NIH BETHESDA | - ALTSCHUL, S. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1992), vol. 89, pages 10915 - 10919 | - JAMESON; WOLF, CABIOS, (1988), vol. 4, pages 181 - 186 | - STURNIOLO, NATURE BIOTECH., (1999), vol. 17, pages 555 - 561 | - SAMBROOK ET AL., MOLECULAR CLONING, A LABORATORY MANUAL | - BETHELL ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1979), vol. 254, pages 2572 - 4 | - HEARN ET AL., J. CHROMATOGR., (1981), vol. 218, pages 509 - 18 | - CHU C. ET AL., INFECT. IMMUNITY, (1983), vol. 245, page 256 | - ZABRISKIE ET AL., J. IND. MICROBIOL, (1987), vol. 2, pages 87 - 95 | - ZABRISKIE ET AL., J. IND. MICROBIOL., (1987), vol. 2, pages 87 - 95 | - CHEN ET AL., BIOCHEM. ENG. J., (2004), vol. 19, pages 211 - 215 | - J.IND. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2010), vol. 37, pages 195 - 204 | - DOEHLERT, APPLIED STATISTICS, (1970), vol. 19, pages 231 - 239 |