EP3156204 - ACOUSTIC CONTROL OF AN OVERMOULDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.10.2020 [2020/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE PLASTIC OMNIUM 19, avenue Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRANDO, Jérôme 85 Impasse Terre du Milieu 38390 VERTRIEU / FR | 02 /
STABLO, Frédéric Le Martaret Rue des Ecoles 38390 PORCIEU AMBLAGNIEU / FR | 03 /
TORRES, Olivier 3 bis rue de la piscine 69230 SAINT-GENIS LAVAL / FR | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | Andrieux, Benoît LLR 11 Boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | [2017/16] | Application number, filing date | 16193564.8 | 12.10.2016 | [2017/16] | Priority number, date | FR20150059720 | 13.10.2015 Original published format: FR 1559720 | [2017/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3156204 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/76, B29C45/14, B29C70/68, B29C33/12 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
B29C45/76 (EP);
B29C45/842 (EP);
B29C2945/76294 (EP);
B29C2945/76471 (EP);
B29C2945/76648 (EP);
B29C2945/76943 (EP);
B29C33/12 (EP);
B29C45/14065 (EP);
B29C45/14631 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] |
Former [2017/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 19.10.2017 | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKUSTISCHE STEUERUNG EINES VERFAHRENS ZUM UMSPRITZEN | [2017/16] | English: | ACOUSTIC CONTROL OF AN OVERMOULDING METHOD | [2017/16] | French: | CONTRÔLE ACOUSTIQUE D'UN PROCÉDÉ DE SURMOULAGE | [2017/16] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 04.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/42] | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2009154386 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * figure 1 * [I] 2-6,8-12; | [A]EP2586587 (GERRESHEIMER REGENSBURG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0007] , [0015] , [0027] , [0028] * * figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP0780208 (HUSKY INJECTION MOLDING [CA]) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 5 - line 8 * * column 4, line 3 - line 7 * * column 5, line 27 - line 39 * * column 8, line 46 - column 9, line 49 *; | [A]DE102008052544 (PRIAMUS SYSTEM TECHNOLOGIES AG [CH]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0008] *; | [A]WO2013002104 (TOYO MACHINERY & METAL [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |