EP3232314 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PROCESSING AN OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. Room 01, Floor 9 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Shuo Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software., Ltd. Room 01, Floor 9 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources NO. 68, Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
JIANG, Dongya Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software., Ltd. Room 01, Floor 9 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources NO. 68, Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Guangjian Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software., Ltd. Room 01, Floor 9 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources NO. 68, Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Sackin, Robert Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2017/42] | Application number, filing date | 16194080.4 | 17.10.2016 | [2017/42] | Priority number, date | CN201610228004 | 13.04.2016 Original published format: CN201610228004 | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3232314 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488, G06F3/0482 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
G06F3/0482 (EP,RU,US);
G06F3/0484 (CN,RU);
G06F3/04847 (KR);
G06F3/0488 (CN,KR,RU,US);
G06F3/04842 (KR,US);
G06F3/04845 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] |
Former [2017/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINES VORGANGS | [2017/42] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PROCESSING AN OPERATION | [2017/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE OPÉRATION | [2017/42] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 12.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/38] | 05.03.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.04.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012036434 (OBERSTEIN TOBIAS GREGOR [DE]); | [XI]US2013212529 (AMARNATH SOMALAPURAM [IN]); | [XI]US2015089407 (SUZUKI TOSHIKAZU [JP]); | [XI]EP2990928 (VODAFONE IP LICENSING LTD [GB]) |