EP3313146 - INDUCTION HEATING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Appliances Aktiebolag S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2018/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIROLI, Alex Electrolux Italia S.p.A. - Forli Factory Viale Bologna, 298 47122 Forli / IT | 02 /
JEANNETEAU, Laurent Electrolux Italia S.p.A. - Forli Factory Viale Bologna, 298 47122 Forli / IT | 03 /
MILANESI, Filippo Electrolux Italia S.p.A. - Forli Factory Viale Bologna, 298 47122 Forli / IT | [2018/17] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/17] | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents 105 45 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 16194328.7 | 18.10.2016 | [2018/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3313146 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/12 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
H05B6/1254 (EP,US);
H05B6/365 (US);
H05B6/062 (US);
H05B6/101 (US);
H05B6/1245 (US);
Y02B40/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] |
Former [2018/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INDUKTIONSERHITZUNGSANORDNUNG | [2018/17] | English: | INDUCTION HEATING ARRANGEMENT | [2018/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE PAR INDUCTION | [2018/17] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 25.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/32] | 01.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0936843 (BALAY SA [ES]) [A] 11,12* figure 1 *; | [XI]WO2009090108 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,13 * figures 5-7 * [I] 3,9-12; | [XI]EP2170010 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,9,13 * figure 2 * [I] 3-8,10-12; | [XI]EP2632230 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [X] 1,3,9,13 * figures 6-7 * [I] 2,4-8,10-12; | [E]EP3094159 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [E] 1,3-7,9,10,13 * figures 13-14 * |