EP3160020 - WHEEL RIM GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jonathan Livingston Engineering Co., Ltd. No. 2, Lane 25, Yongping St. Shilin Dist. 11172 Taipei City / TW | [2017/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lin, Yi-Chuan No.2, Lane 25, Yongping St., Shilin Dist. 11172 Taipei City / TW | [2017/17] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/17] | Lang, Christian LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm Rosenheimer Straße 139 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16194930.0 | 20.10.2016 | [2017/17] | Priority number, date | TW20150134483 | 21.10.2015 Original published format: TW 104134483 | [2017/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3160020 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/18, B60C23/04 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
H02K7/1846 (EP,CN,US);
B60C23/041 (EP,CN,US);
B60B21/12 (US);
B60C23/002 (US);
B60C23/0488 (US);
B60C23/0498 (EP,CN,US);
B60C23/064 (US);
B60C23/10 (EP,US);
B60C29/02 (US);
H02K11/0094 (US);
H02K11/20 (US);
H02K11/33 (US);
H02K7/08 (US);
H02K7/1876 (EP,US);
B60B2900/351 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RADFELGENGENERATOR | [2017/17] | English: | WHEEL RIM GENERATOR | [2017/17] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR DE JANTE DE ROUE | [2017/17] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/17] | 26.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/38] | 19.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2003102154 (FIBER CUP KK) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0013]; figure 2 * [Y] 2,6,7 [I] 3,5; | [Y]US7103460 (BREED DAVID S [US]) [Y] 7 * column 10, lines 43-45 - column 13, lines 30-35 *; | [A]JP2007300758 (SEIKO INSTR INC) [A] 1-7* abstract *; | [Y]US2010283340 (FRADELLA RICHARD B [US]) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0012] *; | [Y]WO2015075655 (NDLOVU RAYMOND [ZA]) [Y] 6 * page 5, lines 10-11 * | by applicant | US4229728 | US7126233 |