EP3163501 - PARKING SPACE DETECTION APPARATUS AND METHOD ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhang, Guocheng 308 Unit 3F, Gate 6 Space 8, Pacific Century Place, No. 2A Gong Ti Bei Lu, Chaoyang District Beijing, 10027 / CN | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/18] | Application number, filing date | 16195021.7 | 21.10.2016 | [2017/18] | Priority number, date | CN201510705589 | 27.10.2015 Original published format: CN201510705589 | [2017/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3163501 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
G06V20/586 (EP,US);
G06T5/70 (US);
G06T7/248 (EP,US);
G06T7/292 (EP,US);
G06V20/52 (US);
G06V20/54 (US);
G08G1/14 (US);
H04N7/181 (US);
G06T2207/10016 (US);
G06T2207/30264 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] |
Former [2017/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PARKLÜCKENNACHWEISVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHRENSELEKTRONISCHE AUSRÜSTUNG | [2017/18] | English: | PARKING SPACE DETECTION APPARATUS AND METHOD ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT | [2017/18] | French: | APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION D'ESPACE DE STATIONNEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉQUIPEMENT ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2017/18] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 07.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.07.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/48] | 18.10.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/48] | Appeal following examination | 08.09.2020 | Appeal received No. T1961/20 | 16.11.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.10.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2015086071 (WU WENCHENG [US], et al) [I] 1-7 * abstract * * §§ 27 and 28 *; | [I]US2015117705 (ZHANG GUOBIAO [US], et al) [I] 1-7 * abstract ** §§ 19 and 36-38 * |