EP3166137 - SEMICONDUCTOR STRUCTURES AND FABRICATION METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semiconductor Manufacturing International (Shanghai) Corporation No. 18, Zhangjiang Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | For all designated states Semiconductor Manufacturing International (Beijing) Corporation No. 18, Wenchang Road Beijing Economic and Technological Development Area, Daxing Area Beijing 100176 / CN | [2018/45] |
Former [2017/24] | For all designated states Semiconductor Manufacturing International Corporation (Shanghai) No. 18, Zhangjiang Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | ||
For all designated states Semiconductor Manufacturing International Corporation (Beijing) No. 18, Wenchang Road Beijing Economic and Technological Development Area, Daxing Area Beijing 100176 / CN | |||
Former [2017/19] | For all designated states Semiconductor Manufacturing International Corporation (Shanghai) No. 18, Zhangjiang Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | ||
For all designated states Semiconductor Manufacturing International Corporation (Beijing) No. 18, Wenchang Road Economic and Technological Development Area, Daxing Area Beijing 1000176 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Fei c/o Semiconductor Manufacturing International Corporation (Shanghai) Mr. Wentian ZHANG No. 18, Zhangjiang Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2017/19] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2017/19] | Application number, filing date | 16196178.4 | 28.10.2016 | [2017/19] | Priority number, date | CN201510749620 | 05.11.2015 Original published format: CN201510749620 | [2017/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3166137 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/8234, // H01L27/088, H01L29/66 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
H01L21/823412 (EP,US);
H01L21/823821 (EP,CN,US);
H01L29/66537 (US);
H01L21/823431 (EP,US);
H01L21/823462 (EP,US);
H01L21/823807 (EP,US);
H01L21/823842 (US);
H01L21/823857 (CN,US);
H01L27/0924 (EP,CN,US);
H01L29/4966 (US);
H01L29/517 (US);
H01L29/66545 (EP,US);
H01L27/0886 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] |
Former [2017/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERSTRUKTUREN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2017/19] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR STRUCTURES AND FABRICATION METHODS THEREOF | [2017/19] | French: | STRUCTURES À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2017/19] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 09.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 17.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2013270619 (SCHLOESSER TILL [DE], et al) [Y] 6,9 * paragraphs [0028] , [0 56]; figure 2a * [A] 1,14; | [Y]US2014227846 (LIAW JHON JHY [TW]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 3] , [0 15] , [0 27] , [0 31]; figure 12 *; | [XYI]US2014319623 (TSAI CURTIS [US], et al) [X] 13,15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0020] - [0 55] - [0069]; figures 1A, 1B, 5A-5I * [Y] 1-12 [I] 14; | [YA]US2015243564 (ZHAO JIE [CN]) [Y] 9 * paragraphs [0069] , [0 71] - [0073] - [0 81]; figures 2C-2E *[A] 14 |