EP3163773 - AN AVALANCHE PHOTODIODE IN A PHOTONIC INTEGRATED CIRCUIT WITH A WAVEGUIDE OPTICAL SAMPLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ranovus Inc. 16 Fitzgerald Road Suite 100 Ottawa, Ontario K2H 8R6 / CA | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Bin 27 Flintridge Crescent Kanata, Ontario K2M 2X9 / CA | 02 /
LOGAN, Dylan 1244 Randall Ave. Ottawa, Ontario K1H 7R1 / CA | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Bingham, Ian Mark The IP Asset Partnership Limited Prama House 267 Banbury Road Oxford OX2 7HT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | Creek, Isobel Clare The IP Asset Partnership Limited Prama House 267 Banbury Road Oxford OX2 7HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 16196225.3 | 28.10.2016 | [2017/18] | Priority number, date | US201514925468 | 28.10.2015 Original published format: US201514925468 | [2017/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3163773 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/69 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
H04B10/6911 (EP,US);
G01J1/44 (US);
G01J1/0425 (US);
G01J1/0429 (US);
G01J2001/4466 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAWINENPHOTODIODE IN EINER INTEGRIERTEN PHOTONISCHEN SCHALTUNG MIT EINER OPTISCHEN WELLENLEITERABTASTVORRICHTUNG | [2017/18] | English: | AN AVALANCHE PHOTODIODE IN A PHOTONIC INTEGRATED CIRCUIT WITH A WAVEGUIDE OPTICAL SAMPLING DEVICE | [2017/18] | French: | PHOTODIODE À AVALANCHE DANS UN CIRCUIT PHOTONIQUE INTÉGRÉ AVEC UN DISPOSITIF D'ÉCHANTILLONNAGE DE GUIDE D'ONDE OPTIQUE | [2017/18] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/45] | 27.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9800943 (PACIFIC FIBEROPTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, lines 23-35 * * page 7, line 42 - page 8, line 33 * * page 10, line 32 - page 12, line 28 ** figures 2A, 2B, 4A, 4B, 5 *; | [A]WO03069379 (FINISAR CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 1 - page 5, line 11 * * figures 4, 8-10 *; | [XI]US2005110105 (KUHARA YOSHIKI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0034] - [0036] * * paragraphs [0061] - [0062] * * figures 1,11 * [I] 2-15; | [I]US2007248357 (FEDIAKINE NIKOLAI [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0020] - [0026] * * figure 1 *; | [XI]US2011142393 (EARNSHAW MARK P [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0038] - [0040] * * figure 6 * [I] 2-15 |