EP3162305 - EXTENSIBLE BUTTRESS ASSEMBLY FOR SURGICAL STAPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon LLC 475 Street C, Suite 401 Los Frailes Industrial Park 00969 Guaynabo / PR | [2020/31] |
Former [2017/18] | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC 475 Street C Los Frailes Industrial Park 00969 Guaynabo / PR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALESSANDRO, Victoria 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US | 02 /
VENDELY, Michael J. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US | 03 /
HARRIS, Jason L. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/18] | Application number, filing date | 16196337.6 | 28.10.2016 | [2017/18] | Priority number, date | US201514926090 | 29.10.2015 Original published format: US201514926090 | [2017/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3162305 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3162305 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/115, A61B17/072, A61L31/06, A61B17/068 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
A61B17/07292 (EP,RU,US);
A61B17/07207 (RU,US);
A61B17/00234 (RU,US);
A61L31/06 (EP,US);
B29C65/4805 (US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00951 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07257 (US);
A61B2017/07271 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61L31/06, C08L67/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] |
Former [2017/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ERWEITERBARE VERSTEIFUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR CHIRURGISCHES KLAMMERGERÄT | [2017/18] | English: | EXTENSIBLE BUTTRESS ASSEMBLY FOR SURGICAL STAPLER | [2017/18] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE CONTREFORT EXTENSIBLE POUR AGRAFEUSE CHIRURGICALE | [2017/18] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 12.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.10.2016 | AL | 05.08.2020 | AT | 05.08.2020 | CY | 05.08.2020 | CZ | 05.08.2020 | DK | 05.08.2020 | EE | 05.08.2020 | ES | 05.08.2020 | FI | 05.08.2020 | HR | 05.08.2020 | LT | 05.08.2020 | LV | 05.08.2020 | MC | 05.08.2020 | MK | 05.08.2020 | MT | 05.08.2020 | NL | 05.08.2020 | PL | 05.08.2020 | RO | 05.08.2020 | RS | 05.08.2020 | SE | 05.08.2020 | SI | 05.08.2020 | SK | 05.08.2020 | SM | 05.08.2020 | TR | 05.08.2020 | IE | 28.10.2020 | LU | 28.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | BG | 05.11.2020 | NO | 05.11.2020 | GR | 06.11.2020 | IS | 05.12.2020 | PT | 07.12.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.10.2016 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
MT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
TR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IE | 28.10.2020 | ||
LU | 28.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
IE | 28.10.2020 | ||
LU | 28.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 28.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 28.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
LU | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006173470 (ORAY B N [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 2, paragraph 23 * * page 3, paragraph 25 - paragraph 27 ** claims 1, 5, 11, 18-20 *; | [I]EP2008595 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [I] 1-12 * column 8, paragraph 35; figure 3C * * claims 1-10 * | by applicant | US4805823 | US5415334 | US5465895 | US5597107 | US5632432 | US5673840 | US5704534 | US5792135 | US5814055 | US5817084 | US5878193 | US6231565 | US6364888 | US6783524 | US6978921 | US7000818 | US7143923 | US7303108 | US7367485 | US7380695 | US7380696 | US2008169328 | US7404508 | US7434715 | US7524320 | US7691098 | US7721930 | US7806891 | US8141762 | US2012132450 | US2012138660 | US8210411 | US2012199630 | US2012199633 | US2012199631 | US2012199632 | US2012203247 | US2012205421 | US2012211546 | US2012241493 | US2013012957 | US8371491 | US2013037596 | US2013062391 | US2013062393 | US2013062394 | US2013068816 | US2013068820 | US2013075446 | US2013075445 | US2013075447 | US8408439 | US2013082086 | US8453914 | US2013206813 | US2013256367 | US8801735 | US2014243801 | US2014239041 | US2014239042 | US2014239036 | US2014239040 | US2014239043 | US2014239037 | US2014239038 | US2014239044 | US2014246473 | US2014263563 |