EP3315292 - THERMOSETTING COMPOSITIONS AND FORMING THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECTS THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEEMAN, Paulus Antonius Maria P.O. Box 4 6100 AA ECHT / NL | 02 /
DRIESSEN, Marco Marcus Matheus P.O. Box 4 6100 AA ECHT / NL | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | dsm-firmenich IP P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2018/18] | DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | Application number, filing date | 16196338.4 | 28.10.2016 | [2018/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3315292 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/00, C08F290/06, B33Y70/00, B33Y10/00 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
C08F290/064 (EP,US);
B29C64/106 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (EP);
B33Y70/00 (EP,US);
B33Y70/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F290/064, C08F220/281 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEHÄRTBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND FORMUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER GEGENSTÄNDE DARAUS | [2018/18] | English: | THERMOSETTING COMPOSITIONS AND FORMING THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECTS THEREFROM | [2018/18] | French: | COMPOSITIONS THERMODURCISSABLES ET RÉALISATION D'OBJETS TRIDIMENSIONNELS À PARTIR DE CELLES-CI | [2018/18] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/19] | 11.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03093901 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1918316 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2010190881 (STEINMANN BETTINA [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2010104603 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-15 * examples 2,4-6; claim - * | by applicant | US2010304088 | US2011104500 |