EP3222943 - SYSTEM AND METHOD TO MAINTAIN EVAPORATOR SUPERHEAT DURING PUMPED REFRIGERANT ECONOMIZER OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vertiv Corporation 1050 Dearborn Drive Columbus, OH 43085 / US | [2018/46] |
Former [2017/39] | For all designated states Liebert Corporation 1050 Dearborn Drive Columbus, OH 43085 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOLL, Roger 817 McDonell Drive Gahanna, OH 43230 / US | 02 /
SCHUTTE, Daniel J. 3315 Foxcroft Drive Lewis Center, OH 43035 / US | 03 /
RAVEN, Matthew 6210 Karl Road Columbus, OH 43229 / US | 04 /
BIRCHMEIER, John 3595 Strine Road Ashley, OH 43003 / US | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Howson, Richard Giles Bentham, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/39] | Howson, Richard G.B., et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16196650.2 | 31.10.2016 | [2017/39] | Priority number, date | US201662311765P | 22.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662311765 P | US201615277569 | 27.09.2016 Original published format: US201615277569 | [2017/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3222943 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F25B49/02 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
F25B49/02 (EP,US);
F25B31/00 (US);
F25B2400/0401 (US);
F25B2400/13 (US);
F25B2500/28 (US);
F25B2600/13 (EP,US);
F25B2600/21 (EP,US);
F25B2600/23 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2513 (EP,US);
F25B2700/02 (EP,US);
F25B2700/19 (US);
F25B2700/197 (EP,US);
F25B2700/2104 (US);
F25B2700/2106 (EP,US);
F25B2700/21172 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] |
Former [2017/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFRECHTERHALTEN DER VERDAMPFERÜBERHITZUNG WÄHREND DES GEPUMPTEN KÜHLMITTELVORWÄRMERBETRIEBS | [2017/39] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD TO MAINTAIN EVAPORATOR SUPERHEAT DURING PUMPED REFRIGERANT ECONOMIZER OPERATION | [2017/39] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MAINTIEN DE LA SURCHAUFFE D'ÉVAPORATEUR PENDANT L'OPÉRATION DE POMPAGE DE L'ÉCONOMISEUR DE FRIGORIGÈNE | [2017/39] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 09.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2013092318 (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0014]; figures 1-4 *; | [I]US2014033753 (LU ZONGTAO [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0111]; figures 9, 10 * | by applicant | US8881541 | US9316424 |