EP3165181 - ADAPTER, EXTENSION, AND CONNECTOR ASSEMBLIES FOR SURGICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2017/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Justin 208 Lantern Park Lane North Southbury, CT 06488 / US | 02 /
WINK, Jon 233 Turkey Hill Rd Haddam, CT 06438 / US | [2017/19] | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2017/19] | Application number, filing date | 16197384.7 | 04.11.2016 | [2017/19] | Priority number, date | US201562251930P | 06.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562251930 P | US201615292761 | 13.10.2016 Original published format: US201615292761 | [2017/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3165181 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/115, A61B17/00 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
A61B17/1155 (EP,CN,US);
A61B18/14 (US);
A61B17/3209 (CN);
A61B2017/00367 (CN);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00473 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00734 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTER, ERWEITERUNG UND VERBINDERANORDNUNGEN FÜR CHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2017/19] | English: | ADAPTER, EXTENSION, AND CONNECTOR ASSEMBLIES FOR SURGICAL DEVICES | [2017/19] | French: | ENSEMBLES D'ADAPTATEUR, D'EXTENSION ET DE CONNECTEURS POUR DES DISPOSITIFS CHIRURGICAUX | [2017/19] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/23] | 22.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005037329 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US], et al) [A] 1,4-14 * page 13, line 11 - page 14, line 2; figures 18,50,61,71 *; | [A]EP2823771 (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [AP]EP3011915 (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [AP] 1-14* the whole document * |