EP3182312 - BINDING AFFINITY SCORING FUNCTION INCLUDING FACTOR FOR ENVIRONS OF RING GROUP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schrödinger, LLC 120 West Forty-Fifth Street 29th Floor, Tower 45 New York, NY 10036-4041 / US | [2017/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Friesner, Richard A. 601 W. 113th Street, Apt. 12A New York, NY New York 10025 / US | 02 /
Murphy, Robert 34 E. Bayview Avenue Englewood Cliffs, NY New York 07632 / US | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | Conroy, John Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2017/25] | Application number, filing date | 16197781.4 | 12.05.2008 | [2017/25] | Priority number, date | US20070930089P | 14.05.2007 Original published format: US 930089 P | [2017/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3182312 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3182312 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/16, G06F19/00 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
G16C20/50 (EP,US);
G16B15/00 (EP,US);
G16B15/30 (EP,US);
G16C20/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/25] | Title | German: | BINDUNGSAFFINITÄTS-BEWERTUNGSFUNKTION MIT EINEM FAKTOR FÜR UMGEBUNGEN EINER RING-GRUPPE | [2017/25] | English: | BINDING AFFINITY SCORING FUNCTION INCLUDING FACTOR FOR ENVIRONS OF RING GROUP | [2017/25] | French: | FONCTION DE NOTATION D'AFFINITÉ DE LIAISON COMPRENANT UN FACTEUR POUR DES ENVIRONS D'UN CYCLE ENCOMBRANT | [2017/25] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/25] | 21.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08755277.4 / EP2162842 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.05.2008 | AT | 03.10.2018 | CY | 03.10.2018 | CZ | 03.10.2018 | EE | 03.10.2018 | FI | 03.10.2018 | HR | 03.10.2018 | LT | 03.10.2018 | LV | 03.10.2018 | MC | 03.10.2018 | MT | 03.10.2018 | NL | 03.10.2018 | PL | 03.10.2018 | RO | 03.10.2018 | SI | 03.10.2018 | SK | 03.10.2018 | TR | 03.10.2018 | BG | 03.01.2019 | NO | 03.01.2019 | GR | 04.01.2019 | IS | 03.02.2019 | PT | 03.02.2019 | IE | 12.05.2019 | LU | 12.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 12.05.2008 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
IE | 12.05.2019 | ||
LU | 12.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
IE | 12.05.2019 | ||
LU | 12.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
IE | 12.05.2019 | ||
LU | 12.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
IE | 12.05.2019 | ||
LU | 12.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
LU | 12.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
LU | 12.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 03.10.2018 | |
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 03.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2006099178 (SCHRODINGER INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 9 - page 8, line 27 * * claims 1-5 ** figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US2007006118 |