EP3150146 - APPARATUS FOR ENDOSCOPIC PROCEDURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2017/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Justin 89 Beebe Street Naugatuck, CT 06770 / US | 02 /
SCIRICA, Paul 264 Thompson Street Huntington, CT 06484 / US | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2017/14] | Application number, filing date | 16198094.1 | 12.03.2014 | [2017/14] | Priority number, date | US201313799379 | 13.03.2013 Original published format: US201313799379 | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3150146 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072, A61B17/29 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,CN,US);
A61B1/0057 (US);
A61B17/00234 (US);
A61B17/068 (US);
A61B17/072 (US);
A61B17/282 (US);
A61B17/29 (US);
A61B17/320016 (CN);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00473 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00734 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07214 (US);
A61B2017/07285 (US);
A61B2017/2903 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2908 (CN);
A61B2017/2925 (CN);
A61B2017/2927 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR ENDOSKOPISCHE VERFAHREN | [2017/14] | English: | APPARATUS FOR ENDOSCOPIC PROCEDURES | [2017/14] | French: | APPAREIL POUR PROCÉDURES ENDOSCOPIQUES | [2017/14] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/15] | 13.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/15] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14159056.2 / EP2777528 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]AU2008229795 (TYCO HEALTHCARE) [Y] 1-12 * page 6, line 3 - page 7, line 8; figures 4, 5, 18-20 * * page 9, line 10 - line 24 *; | [Y]US2009171147 (LEE WOOJIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0078]; figures 2-9 *; | [A]US2009206138 (SMITH BRET W [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * paragraph [0190] - paragraph [0191]; figures 12a,b, 41-44, 64-72 * * paragraph [0208] - paragraph [0209] * | by applicant | WO2009039506 | US2011121049 |