EP3147015 - APPARATUS FOR TREATING WATER USED FOR INDUSTRIAL PURPOSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crystal Lagoons (Curaçao) B.V. Kaya W.F.G. (Jombi) Mensing 14 / CW | [2017/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischmann, T. Fernando Avenida Kennedy 8830 Vitacura, Santiago / CL | [2017/13] | Representative(s) | Frick, Robert Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2017/13] | Application number, filing date | 16198869.6 | 12.09.2011 | [2017/13] | Priority number, date | US201161469537P | 30.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161469537 P | US201113136474 | 01.08.2011 Original published format: US201113136474 | [2017/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3147015 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3147015 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01D21/30, B01D61/04, C02F1/00, C02F1/52, C02F1/76, C02F9/02, // C02F1/24, C02F1/44, C02F1/50, C02F1/56, C02F1/72, C02F1/78, C02F5/08, C02F101/20, C02F103/02, C02F103/08, C02F103/10 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
B01D21/30 (EP,US);
C02F1/52 (KR,RU);
C02F1/50 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C02F1/004 (US);
B01D21/01 (RU);
B01D36/04 (RU);
C02F1/008 (EP,US);
C02F1/72 (KR);
C02F1/24 (EP,US);
C02F1/441 (EP,US);
C02F1/442 (EP,US);
C02F1/444 (EP,US);
C02F1/5236 (EP,US);
C02F1/56 (EP,US);
C02F1/722 (EP,US);
C02F1/76 (EP,US);
C02F1/766 (EP,US);
C02F1/78 (EP,US);
C02F2101/203 (EP,US);
C02F2101/206 (EP,US);
C02F2103/02 (EP,US);
C02F2103/08 (EP,US);
C02F2103/10 (EP,US);
C02F2209/02 (EP,US);
C02F2209/04 (EP,US);
C02F2209/10 (EP,US);
C02F2209/11 (EP,US);
C02F2303/185 (EP,US);
C02F5/08 (EP,US);
Y02A20/131 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/45] |
Former [2017/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 28.09.2017 | ME | 28.09.2017 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON WASSER FÜR INDUSTRIELLE ZWECKE | [2017/13] | English: | APPARATUS FOR TREATING WATER USED FOR INDUSTRIAL PURPOSES | [2017/13] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE L'EAU À DES FINS INDUSTRIELLES | [2017/13] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/45] | 17.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11862833.8 / EP2691340 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   16.11.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.12.2018 | EE | 12.12.2018 | LT | 12.12.2018 | LV | 12.12.2018 | MC | 12.12.2018 | MK | 12.12.2018 | MT | 12.12.2018 | RO | 12.12.2018 | SM | 12.12.2018 | BG | 12.03.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
MT | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | LT | 12.12.2018 | |
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | LT | 12.12.2018 | |
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 12.12.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6228272 (GOLA ANDRE [FR]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [X]US2006174430 (PARETI VITTORIO [IT]) [X] 1-14 * figures 1,2,5 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0047] *; | [X]US2009282627 (PORAT JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1-14 * figures 1,5 * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0098] *; | [X]WO2010074770 (CRYSTAL LAGOONS CORP LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 14, line 10 - page 15, line 33 *; | [A]US2011061194 (FISCHMANN TORRES FERNANDO BENJAMIN [CL]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0126] * * table 4 * | by applicant | JP2011005463 |