EP3150866 - LOCKBOLT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avdel UK Limited 3 Europa Court Sheffield Business Park Sheffield S9 1XE / GB | [2020/27] |
Former [2017/14] | For all designated states Avdel UK Limited 3 Europa Court Sheffield Business Park Sheffield S9 1XE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREWER, Jonathan 1 Kirby Road Dunstable, Bedfordshire LU6 3JH / GB | 02 /
HERSANT, Carl 13 Crouchfield Hertford, Hertfordshire SG14 3LP / GB | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | SBD IPAdmin 270 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4DX / GB | [2020/27] |
Former [2017/14] | Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Herts. AL1 3AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 16199299.5 | 29.05.2013 | [2017/14] | Priority number, date | GB20120016367 | 13.09.2012 Original published format: GB 201216367 | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3150866 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3150866 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16B19/05, B21J15/02 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
F16B19/05 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B21J15/022 (EP,CN,GB,KR,US);
F16B19/08 (GB);
B21J13/06 (US);
B21J5/022 (US);
B21J9/12 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Title | German: | NIETBOLZEN | [2017/14] | English: | LOCKBOLT | [2017/14] | French: | BOULON DE BLOCAGE | [2017/14] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 17.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13726829.8 / EP2895753 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.05.2013 | AL | 01.07.2020 | AT | 01.07.2020 | CY | 01.07.2020 | CZ | 01.07.2020 | DK | 01.07.2020 | EE | 01.07.2020 | ES | 01.07.2020 | FI | 01.07.2020 | HR | 01.07.2020 | IT | 01.07.2020 | LT | 01.07.2020 | LV | 01.07.2020 | MC | 01.07.2020 | MK | 01.07.2020 | NL | 01.07.2020 | PL | 01.07.2020 | RO | 01.07.2020 | RS | 01.07.2020 | SE | 01.07.2020 | SI | 01.07.2020 | SK | 01.07.2020 | SM | 01.07.2020 | BG | 01.10.2020 | NO | 01.10.2020 | GR | 02.10.2020 | IS | 01.11.2020 | PT | 02.11.2020 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 29.05.2013 | |
AL | 01.07.2020 | ||
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 29.05.2013 | |
AL | 01.07.2020 | ||
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 01.07.2020 | |
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 01.07.2020 | |
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | BG | 01.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1629925 (CUSHING MOORE FRED) [A] 1* figure - *; | [A]GB858882 (HUCK MFG CO) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US3091982 (GEORGE SIEBOL) [A] 1-15 * figure - *; | [A]US3295404 (BAKER DYKES M) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US4299519 (CORBETT ROBERT J) [A] 12-15 * figure - *; | [A]CA1168909 (HI SHEAR CORP) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]WO8700891 (HUCK MFG CO [US]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US4995777 (WARMINGTON JOHN H [US]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]EP1981665 (AVDEL UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * figure - * |