EP3323762 - INSTALLATION DEVICE FOR PERFORMING INSTALLATION OPERATIONS IN A LIFT SHAFT OF A LIFT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 09.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2018/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMBRUZZI, Andrea Hirschgartnerweg 34 8057 Zürich / CH | 02 /
BÜTLER, Erich Sonnhaldenrain 50 6030 Ebikon / CH | 03 /
ZIMMERLI, Philipp Eichenweg 5 4624 Härkingen / CH | 04 /
BITZI, Raphael Sonnenrain 17 6006 Luzern / CH | [2018/21] | Application number, filing date | 16199429.8 | 18.11.2016 | [2018/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3323762 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B66B19/00 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
B66B19/00 (EP);
B66B19/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONTAGEVORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINES INSTALLATIONSVORGANGS IN EINEM AUFZUGSCHACHT EINER AUFZUGANLAGE | [2018/21] | English: | INSTALLATION DEVICE FOR PERFORMING INSTALLATION OPERATIONS IN A LIFT SHAFT OF A LIFT ASSEMBLY | [2018/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MONTAGE DESTINÉ À EXÉCUTER UN PROCESSUS D'INSTALLATION DANS UNE CAGE D'ASCENSEUR | [2018/21] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH08277076 (TOSHIBA F A SYSTEM ENG, et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0235] * [I] 5-10; | [XI]WO2012035481 (MASTER DRILLING PTY LTD [ZA], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 5, lines 1-16 * * page 6, lines 7-9 * [I] 3-10; | [A]US6164418 (CHEN CHING HUNG [TW], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 4, lines 17-42 *; | [A]JPH05105362 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2016EP65247 |