EP3170650 - MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE STRIP AND CORRESPONDING PRODUCTION FACILITY FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A SHIP SAIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INCIDENCES TECHNOLOGIES 14 avenue Bernard Moitessier 17180 Perigny / FR | [2020/44] |
Former [2017/21] | For all designated states Incidences Technologies 14 avenue Bernard Moitessier 17180 Perigny / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAUVE, Stéphane 14 av Bernard Moitessier 17180 PERIGNY / FR | 02 /
MORVAN, Pierre-Antoine 14 av Bernard Moitessier 17180 PERIGNY / FR | 03 /
TURBAN, Brice 14 av Bernard Moitessier 17180 PERIGNY / FR | [2017/21] | Representative(s) | IP Trust 2, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/21] | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 16199579.0 | 18.11.2016 | [2017/21] | Priority number, date | FR20150061134 | 19.11.2015 Original published format: FR 1561134 | [2017/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3170650 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3170650 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/50, B29C70/56, B29B15/12, B29C70/20, B63H9/06 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
B29C70/56 (EP,US);
B29B15/125 (EP);
B29B15/14 (EP);
B29C70/20 (EP);
B29C70/504 (EP);
B63H9/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] |
Former [2017/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINES VERBUNDSTOFFBANDES UND ENTSPRECHENDE HERSTELLUNGSANLAGE FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG EINES SEGELS EINES SEGELBOOTES | [2017/21] | English: | MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE STRIP AND CORRESPONDING PRODUCTION FACILITY FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A SHIP SAIL | [2017/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE BANDE COMPOSITE ET INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANTE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UNE VOILE DE BATEAU | [2017/21] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 05.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.11.2016 | AL | 15.07.2020 | AT | 15.07.2020 | CY | 15.07.2020 | CZ | 15.07.2020 | EE | 15.07.2020 | FI | 15.07.2020 | HR | 15.07.2020 | LT | 15.07.2020 | LV | 15.07.2020 | MC | 15.07.2020 | MK | 15.07.2020 | MT | 15.07.2020 | PL | 15.07.2020 | RO | 15.07.2020 | RS | 15.07.2020 | SE | 15.07.2020 | SI | 15.07.2020 | SK | 15.07.2020 | SM | 15.07.2020 | TR | 15.07.2020 | BG | 15.10.2020 | NO | 15.10.2020 | GR | 16.10.2020 | IS | 15.11.2020 | IE | 18.11.2020 | LU | 18.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 18.11.2016 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
MT | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
TR | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
IE | 18.11.2020 | ||
LU | 18.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
IE | 18.11.2020 | ||
LU | 18.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
LU | 18.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
LU | 18.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO9411185 (AMERICA3 FOUNDATION [US]) [YD] 4-7,12-15 * abstract * * page 26, paragraph last - page 28, paragraph 2 ** figures 5-8 *; | [XAYI]US2012251823 (MALDONADO FREDDY [US], et al) [X] 1,8,10,11,16,18,19 * abstract * * figure 2 * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0089] * [A] 3,9,17 [Y] 4-7,12-15 [I] 2 | by applicant | WO9411185 | US8506739 |