EP3323290 - SOIL CONDITIONING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OGET Innovations GmbH Europapark 1 8412 Allerheiligen bei Wildon / AT | [2018/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horváth, András Irirny János út 8. 4485 Nagyhalász / HU | [2018/21] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Bürkleinstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | [2020/27] |
Former [2018/21] | Haseltine Lake LLP Bürkleinstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16199814.1 | 21.11.2016 | [2018/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3323290 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3323290 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01N65/08, A01N65/00, A01N25/02, A01N25/12, C09K17/32, C09K17/40, A01P7/04 | [2019/33] | CPC: |
A01N65/08 (EP,US);
C09K17/14 (US);
C09K17/40 (EP,US);
C09K17/42 (US);
C09K17/32 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N65/08, A01N25/02, A01N25/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/21] | A01N65/08, C09K17/16, A01N25/12, A01N25/02, A01P7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] |
Former [2018/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BODENVERBESSERUNGSMITTEL | [2018/21] | English: | SOIL CONDITIONING AGENTS | [2018/21] | French: | AGENTS D'AMENDEMENT DU SOL | [2018/21] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 13.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.07.2020 | CY | 01.07.2020 | CZ | 01.07.2020 | DK | 01.07.2020 | EE | 01.07.2020 | FI | 01.07.2020 | LT | 01.07.2020 | LV | 01.07.2020 | MC | 01.07.2020 | MK | 01.07.2020 | MT | 01.07.2020 | RS | 01.07.2020 | SE | 01.07.2020 | SM | 01.07.2020 | TR | 01.07.2020 | BG | 01.10.2020 | NO | 01.10.2020 | GR | 02.10.2020 | IS | 01.11.2020 | PT | 02.11.2020 | IE | 21.11.2020 | LU | 21.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
MT | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
TR | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 21.11.2020 | ||
LU | 21.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 21.11.2020 | ||
LU | 21.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
LU | 21.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 01.07.2020 | |
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 01.07.2020 | |
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | BG | 01.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4676985 (GOULD FRED L [US], et al) [X] 8 * column 2, lines 5-16, 21-29 *; | [XY]CN104082347 (WUHU OUBIAO AGRICULTURAL DEV CO LTD) [X] 8 * claims 1-3 *[Y] 1-15; | [X] - MICHAEL VILLANI ET AL, "Butterfly milkweed extract as a feeding deterrent of the wireworm, Melanotus communis", ENTOMOLOGIA EXPERIMENTALIS ET APPLICATA., NL, (19850105), vol. 37, no. 1, doi:10.1111/j.1570-7458.1985.tb03458.x, ISSN 0013-8703, pages 95 - 100, XP055337486 [X] 8,13,14 * abstract * * page 96, columns 1-2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1570-7458.1985.tb03458.x | [XY] - MICHAEL VILLANI AND FRED GOULD, "Screening of crude plant extracts as feeding deterrents of the wireworm, Melanotus communis", ENTOMOLOGIA EXPERIMENTALIS ET APPLICATA, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, NL, (19850301), vol. 37, no. 1, doi:10.1007/BF00366810, ISSN 0013-8703, pages 69 - 75, XP009117234 [X] 8,13-15 * abstract * * page 70, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 74; table 4 * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00366810 | [XY] - R E Harry-O 'kuru ET AL, "Milkweed seedmeal: a control for Meloidogyne chitwoodi on potatoes", ELSEVIER Industrial Crops and Products, (19990101), pages 145 - 150, URL: https://pubag.nal.usda.gov/pubag/downloadPDF.xhtml?id=25487&content=PDF, XP055337497 [X] 8,13-15 * pages 146-147; tables 2-4 * * page 149, paragraph 3.3 * [Y] 1-15 | [XY] - ROBERT P ADAMS ET AL, "Phytochemicals for liquid fuels and petrochemical substitutions: Extraction procedures and screening resuls", ECONOMIC BOTANY, (19830401), vol. 37, no. 2, doi:10.1007/BF02858787, pages 207 - 215, XP055337512 [X] 1,2,5-8 * pages 210-212; tables 1-3 * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02858787 | [XY] - R. A. BUCHANAN ET AL, "Hydrocarbon- and rubber-producing crops", ECONOMIC BOTANY., US, (19780401), vol. 32, no. 2, doi:10.1007/BF02866867, ISSN 0013-0001, pages 131 - 145, XP055337521 [X] 1,2,5-8 * page 8 * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02866867 | [XY] - GABRIELLA KAZINCZI ET AL, "ALLELOPATHY OF SOME IMPORTANT WEEDS IN HUNGARY", ZBORNIK PREDAVANJ IN REFERATOV 11. SLOVENSKEGA POSVETOVANJA O VARSTVU RASTLIN Z MEDNARODNO UDELEZBO, (20131112), doi:http://citenpl.internal.epo.org/wf/web/citenpl/citenpl.html?_url=http%3A//dvrs.bf.uni-lj.si/spvr/2013/71Kazinczi.pdf, pages 410 - 415, XP055337523 [X] 8,13,14 * pages 412-413, paragraph 4; figure 2 * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/http://citenpl.internal.epo.org/wf/web/citenpl/citenpl.html?_url=http%3A//dvrs.bf.uni-lj.si/spvr/2013/71Kazinczi.pdf | [XY] - Z. A. M. BAKA, "Efficacy of wild medicinal plant extracts against predominant seed-borne fungi of broad bean cultivars", ACTA PHYTOPATHOLOGICA ET ENTOMOLOGICA HUNGARICA, HU, (20150601), vol. 50, no. 1, doi:10.1556/038.50.2015.1.5, ISSN 0238-1249, pages 45 - 65, XP055337526 [X] 8 * abstract * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1556/038.50.2015.1.5 |