EP3238807 - FILTRER ELEMENT UTILIZING PLEATED CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/44] | FILTRATION ARRANGEMENT UTILIZING PLEATED CONSTRUCTION AND METHOD | ||
[2020/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES, GB | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DONALDSON COMPANY, INC. 1400 West 94th Street Minneapolis, MN 55440 / US | [2020/49] |
Former [2017/44] | For all designated states DONALDSON COMPANY, INC. 1400 West 94th Street Minneapolis, MN 55440 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOGINS, Mark A. 806 Millwood Avenue Roseville, MN Minnesota 55113 / US | 02 /
WEIK, Thomas M. 18870 Azure Road Deephaven, MN Minnesota 55391 / US | 03 /
BARRIS, Marty A. 19526 Iredell Court Lakeville, MN Minnesota 55044 / US | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/49] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2017/44] | Valea AB Anna Lindhs Plats 4 211 19 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 16199996.6 | 10.08.2001 | [2017/44] | Priority number, date | US20000230138P | 05.09.2000 Original published format: US 230138 P | US20010871582 | 31.05.2001 Original published format: US 871582 | [2017/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3238807 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3238807 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/52 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
B01D46/521 (EP,US);
B01D46/52 (KR);
B01D39/1623 (EP,US);
B01D46/0001 (EP,US);
B01D46/0005 (EP,US);
B01D46/121 (EP,US);
B01D46/2411 (EP,US);
B01D46/546 (EP,US);
B01D46/71 (EP,US);
D01F6/90 (EP,US);
D01F6/92 (EP,US);
D04H1/728 (EP,US);
B01D2239/025 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0654 (EP,US);
B01D2239/10 (EP,US);
B01D2239/1233 (EP,US);
B01D2271/027 (EP,US);
B01D2279/60 (EP,US);
Y02A50/2351 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2018/23] |
Former [2017/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | FILTRATIONSELEMENT MIT GEFALTETER KONSTRUKTION | [2020/26] | English: | FILTRER ELEMENT UTILIZING PLEATED CONSTRUCTION | [2020/26] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE FILTRATION UTILISANT UNE STRUCTURE PLISSÉE | [2020/26] |
Former [2017/44] | FILTRATIONSANORDNUNG MIT GEFALTETER KONSTRUKTION UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2017/44] | FILTRATION ARRANGEMENT UTILIZING PLEATED CONSTRUCTION AND METHOD | ||
Former [2017/44] | SYSTÈME DE FILTRATION UTILISANT UNE STRUCTURE PLISSÉE ET PROCÉDÉ | Examination procedure | 22.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 07.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 13.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.06.2020 | 05.06.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01962050.9 / EP1355714 | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.07.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 13.07.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.07.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 14.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.12.2020 | DK | 02.12.2020 | ES | 02.12.2020 | FI | 02.12.2020 | NL | 02.12.2020 | SE | 02.12.2020 | GR | 03.03.2021 | PT | 05.04.2021 | GB | 09.08.2021 | IE | 10.08.2021 | [2022/08] |
Former [2021/49] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
IE | 10.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
IE | 10.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 02.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4650506 (BARRIS MARTY A [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * column 3, line 37 - column 5, line 14; table 1 *; | [I]DE29907699U (FIBERMARK GESSNER GMBH & CO [DE]) [I] 1-13* page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 5; claims 1,2,4-9 * | by applicant | US2764602 | US2764603 | US2803656 | US3147064 | US3255131 | US3450755 | US4042522 | US4069158 | US4069244 | US4082476 | US4090967 | US4161590 | US4161602 | US4720292 | US4900671 | US5104537 | US5153298 | US5672399 | US5820646 | US5853442 | US5954849 | USD425189S | - J.E. WALZ; G.B. TAYLOR, "determination of the molecular weight of nylon", ANAL. CHEM., (1947), vol. 19, no. 7, pages 448 - 450 | - Nylon Plastics Handbook, HANSER PUBLISHER, (1995), page 286 | - Nylon Plastics handbook, HANSER PUBLISHER, (1995), page 447 | - "Nylon Plastics Handbook", MELVINKOHAN, Nylon Plastics Handbook, HANSER PUBLISHER, (1995), page 286 | - Handbook of Solubility Parameters and other cohesion parameters, CRC PRESS, (1985), page 317 |