EP3173768 - GAS CELL FOR ABSORPTION SPECTROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unisearch Associates Inc. 96 Bradwick Drive Concord, Ontario L4K 1K8 / CA | For all designated states Unisearch Instruments Nanjing Inc. 1F, Building 23 Advanced Business Park No. 70, Pheonix Road Jiangning Industry Zone Nanjing 211100 / CN | [2017/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANDA, Alak 2 Hemlark Court Brampton, Ontario L6S 2B7 / CA | 02 /
WU, Shimin 3-1-202, No. 81 Fuchunjiang East Street Jianye District Nanjing, 210019 / CN | [2017/22] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/22] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 16200350.3 | 23.11.2016 | [2017/22] | Priority number, date | CN201510831578 | 25.11.2015 Original published format: CN201510831578 | US201562267709P | 15.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562267709 P | [2017/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3173768 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3173768 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/03, G01J3/02, // G01N21/15, G01J3/42 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
G01J3/42 (EP,US);
G01N21/33 (CN);
G01N21/3504 (US);
G01J3/021 (EP,US);
G01N21/03 (CN);
G01N21/0303 (EP,US);
G01N21/0332 (EP,US);
G01N21/255 (US);
G01N21/61 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/22] | G01N21/03, G01J3/42, G01N21/15 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] |
Former [2017/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GASZELLE FÜR ABSORPTIONSSPEKTROSKOPIE | [2017/22] | English: | GAS CELL FOR ABSORPTION SPECTROSCOPY | [2017/22] | French: | CELLULE À GAZ POUR SPECTROSCOPIE D'ABSORPTION | [2017/22] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/01] | 19.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2016 | AL | 23.10.2019 | AT | 23.10.2019 | CY | 23.10.2019 | CZ | 23.10.2019 | DK | 23.10.2019 | EE | 23.10.2019 | ES | 23.10.2019 | FI | 23.10.2019 | HR | 23.10.2019 | IT | 23.10.2019 | LT | 23.10.2019 | LV | 23.10.2019 | MC | 23.10.2019 | MK | 23.10.2019 | MT | 23.10.2019 | NL | 23.10.2019 | PL | 23.10.2019 | RO | 23.10.2019 | RS | 23.10.2019 | SE | 23.10.2019 | SI | 23.10.2019 | SK | 23.10.2019 | SM | 23.10.2019 | TR | 23.10.2019 | IE | 23.11.2019 | LU | 23.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | BG | 23.01.2020 | NO | 23.01.2020 | GR | 24.01.2020 | IS | 23.02.2020 | PT | 24.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.11.2016 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
TR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 23.11.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 23.11.2016 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 23.11.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 23.11.2016 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 23.11.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 23.11.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 23.11.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 23.11.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
LU | 23.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 23.10.2019 | |
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 23.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CA2886213 (UNISEARCH ASSOCIATES INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,8-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [00 6]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0096] - [0100] - [ 0111]; figures 2a - 2d * * paragraphs [0069] , [ 130]; figures 8, 9 * * paragraph [0135]; figure 2d *; | [X]US5223716 (ROSSITER VALENTINE J [IE]) [X] 1-7,11-13 * column 2, lines 28-68; figure 1a *; | [XI]EP2108937 (SICK MAIHAK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8,13-15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1,2 * [I] 9 | Examination | EP1022558 |