EP3255573 - CLINICAL DECISION SUPPORTING ENSEMBLE SYSTEM AND CLINICAL DECISON SUPPORTING METHOD USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 161 Gajeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34129 / KR | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Youngwoong Jukdong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Jae Hun 317, Jijok-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon / KR | 03 /
KIM, Young Won 103-1301, Daelim Dure Apt. 65, Gajeong-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon / KR | 04 /
KIM, Minho 65, Gajeong-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon / KR | 05 /
LIM, Myung-eun 112-1207, Han Meul Apt. 16, Gujeuk-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon / KR | 06 /
JUNG, Ho-Youl 353, Noeun-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon / KR | 07 /
LEE, Dong-Hun 23, Jeonmin-ro, 34beon-gil, Yuseong-gu Daejeon / KR | 08 /
KIM, Dae Hee 401, ParkVill, 80-2, Wonnae-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon / KR | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2017/50] | Application number, filing date | 16200822.1 | 25.11.2016 | [2017/50] | Priority number, date | KR20160072645 | 10.06.2016 Original published format: KR 20160072645 | KR20160142185 | 28.10.2016 Original published format: KR 20160142185 | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3255573 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G06N20/20 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G16Z99/00 (EP,US);
Y02A90/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] |
Former [2017/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLINISCHES ENTSCHEIDUNGSUNTERSTÜTZUNGS-KOMPONENTENSYSTEM UND ENTSPRECHENDES KLINISCHES UNTERSTÜTZUNGSVERFAHREN | [2017/50] | English: | CLINICAL DECISION SUPPORTING ENSEMBLE SYSTEM AND CLINICAL DECISON SUPPORTING METHOD USING THE SAME | [2017/50] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ENSEMBLE DE PRISE EN CHARGE DE DÉCISION CLINIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRISE EN CHARGE DE DÉCISION CLINIQUE L'UTILISANT | [2017/50] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 17.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/04] | 08.08.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/04] | 03.09.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008201280 (MARTIN HUBER [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]US2012283574 (PARK SUN YOUNG [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]WO2016029166 (FURNESS THOMAS ADRIAN III [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 17, lines 24-28 ** page 19, lines 24-30 * | by applicant | KR20090000196 | KR101558142B |