EP3176718 - CONTROL METHOD, PROCESSING APPARATUS, AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENDO, Mitsuru c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
HORII, Noriaki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/23] | Application number, filing date | 16200969.0 | 28.11.2016 | [2017/23] | Priority number, date | JP20150236141 | 02.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015236141 | [2017/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3176718 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3176718 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
G16H10/20 (EP,US);
G06F16/338 (US);
G06F16/29 (EP,US);
G06F16/322 (EP,US);
G06F16/3329 (CN);
G06F16/3344 (EP,US);
G06T11/206 (US);
G06T11/60 (US);
G10L15/22 (CN);
G16H50/20 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] |
Former [2017/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN, VERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2017/23] | English: | CONTROL METHOD, PROCESSING APPARATUS, AND RECORDING MEDIUM | [2017/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE, APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2017/23] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 20.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.09.2021 | 14.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/06] | 23.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.09.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002032878 (KARPF RONALD S [US]) [I] 1-17 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0124] *; | [I]US2003140063 (PIZZORNO JOSEPH E [US], et al) [I] 1-17 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0135] *; | [I]US2006030890 (COSENTINO DANIEL L [US], et al) [I] 1-17 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0245] *; | [I]US2013117280 (DONALDSON J JUSTIN [US], et al) [I] 1-17 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0079] *; | [I]US2015227701 (NICOLAAS ARVID RANDAL [NL]) [I] 1-17* paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0178] * | by applicant | JP2001325104 |