EP3176368 - COATED AND UNCOATED SURFACE-MODIFIED AIRFOILS FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE DIRECTION OF INCIDENT ENERGY REFLECTION FROM THE AIRFOIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2017/23] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VELAZQUEZ, Jr., Miguel Angel 230 Ridge Road Wethersfield, CT 06109 / US | 02 /
ROSENKRANTZ, Adam M. 38 Sunnybrook Drive Newington, CT 06111 / US | 03 /
CUVA, Rocco S. 65 Backland Road South Glastonbury, CT 06073 / US | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/23] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16201948.3 | 02.12.2016 | [2017/23] | Priority number, date | US201514957208 | 02.12.2015 Original published format: US201514957208 | [2017/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3176368 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14, F01D5/28, B64C21/10, C23C4/02, H01Q15/14 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
F01D5/141 (EP,US);
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2230/31 (EP,US);
F05D2230/50 (US);
F05D2240/301 (US);
F05D2250/11 (US);
F05D2250/12 (US);
F05D2250/232 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] |
Former [2017/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETE UND UNBESCHICHTETE OBERFLÄCHENMODIFIZIERTE SCHAUFELN FÜR EIN GASTURBINENTRIEBWERK UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER REFLEKTIONSRICHTUNG EINFALLENDER STRAHLUNG VON DER SCHAUFEL | [2017/23] | English: | COATED AND UNCOATED SURFACE-MODIFIED AIRFOILS FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE DIRECTION OF INCIDENT ENERGY REFLECTION FROM THE AIRFOIL | [2017/23] | French: | PROFILE D'AUBE À SURFACES MODIFIÉES REVÊTUES ET NON REVÊTUES POUR UN MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ ET PROCÉDÉ POUR CONTRÔLER LA DIRECTION DE RÉFLEXION DE L'ÉNERGIE INCIDENTE À PARTIR DU PROFILE D'AUBE | [2017/23] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 06.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/24] | 08.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012103430 (LIN ZUEI-LING [TW]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0026] - [0029] - [0033]; figures 3-6 *; | [X]US6471881 (CHAI YAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US6074706 (BEVERLEY MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 4; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2015321289 (BRUCK GERALD J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]GB2272453 (MTU MUENCHEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-12 * pages 1-5; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]DE9013099U (MOSER JOSEF) [X] 9,11,12 * figures 1-13 * [Y] 1-3,5-8,14,15; | [XY]EP2597284 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 9-12 * paragraphs [0014] , [0023] - [0030]; figures 3,4 * [Y] 1-8,13-15; | [XY]US3741285 (KUETHE A) [X] 9,11,12 * figures 1-11 * [Y] 1-5,7,8,13-15; | [XY]WO2013026127 (CASTANON SEOANE DIEGO [CA]) [X] 9,11,12 * figures 1-6 * [Y] 1-5,7,8,13-15; | [XY]US6092766 (LAROCHE ULRICH [CH], et al) [X] 9,11,12 * figures 1,2,6-9 * [Y] 1-3,5,8,14,15; | [X]WO2015057409 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 4; figure 2B *; | [YA]US4501784 (MOSHINSKY IGOR B [US]) [Y] 1-8,10,13-15 * the whole document * [A] 9,11,12; | [Y]US2006086077 (SKOOG ANDREW J [US], et al) [Y] 1,6-8,10,13-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0037] , [0041] , [0042]; figure 2 *; | [Y]US5093054 (HIROTA KASHICHI [JP]) [Y] 6,7,10 * column 5; figure 2 * |