EP3210966 - ALKOXYPHENYLPROPYLAMINES FOR THE TREATMENT OF AGE-RELATED MACULAR DEGENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT, TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acucela, Inc. 818 Stewart Street Suite 1110 Seattle, Washington 98101-3805 / US | [2019/51] |
Former [2017/35] | For all designated states Acucela, Inc. 21720-23rd Drive SE, Suite 120 Bothell, WA 98021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCOTT, Ian L. 22906 111th Street SE Monroe, WA 98272 / US | 02 /
KUKSA, Vladimir A. 417 203rd PI SE Bothell, WA 98012 / US | 03 /
ORME, Mark W. 10715 Palatine Avenue North Seattle, WA 98133 / US | 04 /
LITTLE, Thomas 18619 NE 100th Court Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 05 /
GALL, Anna 20051 170th Avenue NE Woodinville, WA 98072 / US | 06 /
HONG, Feng 10042 Main Street, Apt. 301 Bellevue, WA 98004 / US | [2017/35] | Representative(s) | Wytenburg, Wilhelmus Johannes Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2020/02] |
Former [2017/35] | Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | Application number, filing date | 16201976.4 | 03.10.2008 | [2017/35] | Priority number, date | US20070977957P | 05.10.2007 Original published format: US 977957 P | US20080066353P | 19.02.2008 Original published format: US 66353 P | US20080043127P | 07.04.2008 Original published format: US 43127 P | US20080051657P | 08.05.2008 Original published format: US 51657 P | US20080060083P | 09.06.2008 Original published format: US 60083 P | [2017/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3210966 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3210966 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07C217/20, C07C217/60, C07C217/72, C07C225/16, C07C229/38, C07C235/08, C07C317/28, C07D277/24, C07D309/06, A61K31/137, A61K31/138, A61K31/145, A61K31/155, A61P27/02 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
A61K31/137 (EP,GB,US);
A61K31/138 (GB);
A61K31/155 (GB);
A61K31/165 (EP,GB,US);
A61K31/222 (EP,US);
A61K31/351 (GB);
A61K31/426 (GB);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07C211/27 (GB);
C07C211/28 (GB);
C07C215/20 (US);
C07C217/20 (EP,US);
C07C217/60 (EP,US);
C07C217/62 (EP,US);
C07C217/64 (EP,US);
C07C217/72 (EP,US);
C07C217/84 (US);
C07C225/16 (EP,US);
C07C229/38 (EP,US);
C07C233/01 (GB);
C07C233/18 (EP,US);
C07C235/08 (EP,US);
C07C251/86 (EP,US);
C07C279/08 (EP,US);
C07C309/06 (US);
C07C317/28 (EP,US);
C07C323/25 (EP,US);
C07C323/33 (US);
C07D277/24 (EP,US);
C07D309/06 (EP,US);
C07C2601/02 (EP,US);
C07C2601/04 (EP,US);
C07C2601/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/35] | Title | German: | ALKOXY PHENYPROPYLAMINEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ALTERSABHÄNGIGEN MAKULA-DEGENERATION | [2017/35] | English: | ALKOXYPHENYLPROPYLAMINES FOR THE TREATMENT OF AGE-RELATED MACULAR DEGENERATION | [2017/35] | French: | ALCOXYPHÉNYLPROPYLAMINES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DÉGÉNÉRESCENCE MACULAIRE LIÉE À L'ÂGE | [2017/35] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 02.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08832784.6 / EP2091955 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.10.2008 | AT | 08.01.2020 | CY | 08.01.2020 | CZ | 08.01.2020 | DK | 08.01.2020 | EE | 08.01.2020 | FI | 08.01.2020 | HR | 08.01.2020 | LT | 08.01.2020 | LV | 08.01.2020 | MC | 08.01.2020 | MT | 08.01.2020 | NL | 08.01.2020 | PL | 08.01.2020 | RO | 08.01.2020 | SE | 08.01.2020 | SI | 08.01.2020 | SK | 08.01.2020 | TR | 08.01.2020 | BG | 08.04.2020 | NO | 08.04.2020 | GR | 09.04.2020 | IS | 08.05.2020 | PT | 31.05.2020 | IE | 03.10.2020 | LU | 03.10.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/46] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 03.10.2020 | ||
LU | 03.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
LU | 03.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 08.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0706994 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]); | [A]WO2007038372 (ALCON INC [CH], et al); | by applicant | US4569354 | US5641750 | WO9812303 | US5736516 | WO9929279 | WO0040699 | US6090624 | US6117675 | US6183735 | WO0109327 | WO0142784 | WO0181551 | WO0183714 | US2002009713 | US6406840 | US2003032078 | US2003050283 | US6713300 | US2004116403 | US2004147019 | US2005059148 | US2006069078 | US2007002275 | WO2007US02330 |