EP3329923 - THE POTENTIAL OF CRBN-INDEPENDENT IMID RESENSITIZATION BY EPIGENETIC THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Copenhagen Nørregade 10 1165 Copenhagen K / DK | For all designated states Rigshospitalet Blegdamsvej 9 2100 Copenhagen / DK | [2018/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dimopoulos, Konstantinos Rigshospitalet, Hematology Lab Ole Maaløes Vej 5 2100 Copenhagen / DK | 02 /
Grønbæk, Kirsten Rigshospitalet, Hematology Lab Ole Maaløes Vej 5 2100 Copenhagen / DK | [2018/23] | Representative(s) | Aera A/S Niels Hemmingsens Gade 10, 5th Floor 1153 Copenhagen / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2018/23] | Aera A/S Gammel Kongevej 60, 18th floor 1850 Frederiksberg C / DK | Application number, filing date | 16202005.1 | 02.12.2016 | [2018/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3329923 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7068, A61K31/5355, A61K45/06, A61P35/00 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
A61K31/7068 (EP);
A61K31/5355 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/5355, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/7068, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POTENZIAL VON CRBN-UNABHÄNGIGER IMIDRESENSIBILISIERUNG DURCH EPIGENETISCHE THERAPIE | [2018/23] | English: | THE POTENTIAL OF CRBN-INDEPENDENT IMID RESENSITIZATION BY EPIGENETIC THERAPY | [2018/23] | French: | POTENTIEL DE RESENSIBILISATION AUX IMID INDÉPENDAMMENT DU CÉRÉBLON PAR LA THÉRAPIE ÉPIGÉNÉTIQUE | [2018/23] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - RICHARD L MOMPARLER ET AL, "Targeting of cancer stem cells by inhibitors of DNA and histone methylation", EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, UK, (20150525), vol. 24, no. 8, doi:10.1517/13543784.2015.1051220, ISSN 1354-3784, pages 1031 - 1043, XP055371084 [X] 1,3,5,7,8,14,15 * abstract * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543784.2015.1051220 | [X] - KRISTIAN HELIN ET AL, "Chromatin proteins and modifications as drug targets", NATURE, United Kingdom, (20131023), vol. 502, no. 7472, doi:10.1038/nature12751, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 480 - 488, XP055371163 [X] 1,5,7,8,12,13,15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature12751 | [Y] - Anna Kalff ET AL, "Roar: A Phase Ib Trial of Oral Azacitidine in Combination with Lenalidomide and Dexamethasone for Relapsed Multiple Myeloma (MM) Patients Refractory to Prior Lenalidomide | Blood Journal", (20151201), URL: http://www.bloodjournal.org/content/126/23/3033?sso-checked=true, (20170510), XP055371262 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * |