EP3182444 - METHOD FOR REDUCING LOSS OF SILICON CAP LAYER OVER SIGE SOURCE/DRAIN IN A CMOS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semiconductor Manufacturing International (Shanghai) Corporation No. 18, Zhangjiang Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | For all designated states Semiconductor Manufacturing International (Beijing) Corporation No. 18, Wenchang Road Beijing Economic and Technological Development Area, Daxing Area Beijing 100176 / CN | [2018/45] |
Former [2017/31] | For all designated states Semiconductor Manufacturing International Corporation (Shanghai) No. 18, Zhangjiang Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | ||
For all designated states Semiconductor Manufacturing International Corporation (Beijing) No. 18, Wenchang Road Beijing Economic and Technological Development Area, Daxing Area Beijing 100176 / CN | |||
Former [2017/25] | For all designated states Semiconductor Manufacturing International Corporation (Shanghai) No. 18, Zhangjiang Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | ||
For all designated states Semiconductor Manufacturing International Corporation (Beijing) No. 18, Wenchang Road Economic and Technological Development Area, Daxing Area Beijing 1000176 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jialei c/o Semiconductor Manufacturing International Corporation (Shanghai) Mr. Wentian ZHANG No. 18, Zhangjiang Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai, 201203 / CN | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2017/25] | Application number, filing date | 16202837.7 | 08.12.2016 | [2017/25] | Priority number, date | CN201510939766 | 15.12.2015 Original published format: CN201510939766 | [2017/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3182444 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/8238 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
H01L21/823814 (EP,US);
H01L21/8238 (CN);
H01L21/823807 (CN);
H01L21/823864 (EP,US);
H01L27/092 (US);
H01L29/0847 (US);
H01L29/161 (US);
H01L29/165 (US);
H01L29/7845 (CN);
H01L29/7848 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] |
Former [2017/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DES VERLUSTES EINER SILICIUMDECKSCHICHT ÜBER SIGE-SOURCE-/DRAIN BEI EINER CMOS-VORRICHTUNG | [2017/25] | English: | METHOD FOR REDUCING LOSS OF SILICON CAP LAYER OVER SIGE SOURCE/DRAIN IN A CMOS DEVICE | [2017/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR RÉDUIRE LES PERTES DE COUCHE DE PROTECTION EN SILICIUM SUR SOURCE/DRAIN EN SIGE DANS UN DISPOSITIF CMOS | [2017/25] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 27.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/53] | 27.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008124922 (KAWAMURA KAZUO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0070]; figures 8-10 *; | [Y]US2011070701 (NING XIAN JIE [CN], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0054] - [0069]; figures 4-10 *; | [A]US2011201166 (CHUNG HOI-SUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1* paragraph [0112]; figures 9-16 * |