EP3185187 - BIOMETRIC BASED PERSONALIZED SETTINGS FOR A DRIVING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thunder Power New Energy Vehicle Development Company Limited 9/F 1 Lyndhurst Terrace Central, Hong Kong / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2017/26] | For all designated states Thunder Power New Energy Vehicle Development Company Limited 9/F 1 Lyndhurst Terrace Central, Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ding Jia-Wei Rm. 5, 7F, No. 47, Sec. 5, Nanjing E. Rd. Song shan Dist. Taipei City / TW | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [2017/26] | Application number, filing date | 16203355.9 | 12.12.2016 | [2017/26] | Priority number, date | US201514977627 | 21.12.2015 Original published format: US201514977627 | [2017/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3185187 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00, G06Q50/30 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
G06Q10/00 (EP,US);
B60R16/037 (CN,US);
G06Q50/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] |
Former [2017/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOMETRISCH PERSONALISIERTE EINSTELLUNGEN ZUR ANSTEUERUNG EINER VORRICHTUNG | [2017/26] | English: | BIOMETRIC BASED PERSONALIZED SETTINGS FOR A DRIVING APPARATUS | [2017/26] | French: | RÉGLAGES PERSONNALISÉS À BASE BIOMÉTRIQUE POUR UN APPAREIL D'ENTRAÎNEMENT | [2017/26] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 12.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.09.2020 | 01.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/48] | 21.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/48] | 24.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2012117094 (PRATT JAMES [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0123] *; | [I]US2013211669 (DEPETRO MATTHEW J [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] ** paragraph [0022] *; | [I]US8527146 (JACKSON DEAN KENNETH [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 5 - column 2, line 21 * * column 3, line 58 - columns 3-67 * * column 4, line 56 - column 6, line 25 * * column 7, line 4 - column 8, line 58 * * column 12, line 10 - column 12 * |