EP3189951 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A WOOD PALETTE AND WOOD PANEL PRODUCTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWISS KRONO Tec AG Museggstrasse 14 6004 Luzern / CH | [2017/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sperlich, Daniel Kirchstraße 12 16945 Halenbeck-Rohlsdorf / DE | 02 /
Richter, Andreas Am Wiesenhang 3 16909 Wittstock / DE | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | Lins, Martina Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [2017/28] | Application number, filing date | 16203875.6 | 13.12.2016 | [2017/28] | Priority number, date | EP20150201298 | 18.12.2015 Original published format: EP 15201298 | [2017/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3189951 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3189951 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B27N1/02, B27N3/18, // B27N3/04, B27N7/00 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
B27N3/04 (EP,US);
B27N1/02 (EP,RU,US);
B27N1/029 (EP,US);
B27N3/002 (US);
B27N3/18 (EP,RU,US);
B27N7/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] |
Former [2017/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER HOLZWERKSTOFFPLATTE UND HOLZWERKSTOFFPLATTEN-HERSTELLVORRICHTUNG | [2017/28] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A WOOD PALETTE AND WOOD PANEL PRODUCTION DEVICE | [2017/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PANNEAU DE BOIS ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'UN PANNEAU DE BOIS | [2017/28] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 15.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2016 | AL | 26.09.2018 | CY | 26.09.2018 | CZ | 26.09.2018 | DK | 26.09.2018 | EE | 26.09.2018 | FI | 26.09.2018 | HR | 26.09.2018 | LT | 26.09.2018 | LV | 26.09.2018 | MC | 26.09.2018 | MK | 26.09.2018 | MT | 26.09.2018 | RO | 26.09.2018 | RS | 26.09.2018 | SE | 26.09.2018 | SI | 26.09.2018 | SK | 26.09.2018 | SM | 26.09.2018 | IE | 13.12.2018 | BG | 26.12.2018 | NO | 26.12.2018 | GR | 27.12.2018 | IS | 26.01.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/29] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/27] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 26.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | WO2015133091 [ ]; | [XAYI]WO9201540 (MAC MILLAN BLOEDEL LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,10,11,13 * figures 1-4 * * claims 1-8,10,15-21,23,27-32,34,35 * * claims 38,39,49,50,52,53,55,57-59 * * page 1, line 3 - line 16 * * page 3, line 5 - line 15 * * page 3, line 24 - line 27 * * page 5, line 14 - line 18 * * page 6, line 9 - line 16 * * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 17 * * page 8, line 6 - line 13 * * page 8, line 20 - page 9, line 19 * * page 10, line 3 - line 9 * * page 12, line 19 - line 26 * * page 13, line 3 - line 6 * * page 13, line 12 - page 14, line 26 * * page 15, line 13 - line 29 * * page 15, line 34 - page 16, line 7 * * page 16, line 27 - line 34 * [A] 8,14 [Y] 1,10 [I] 5,9,12; | [Y]US5228947 (CHURCHLAND MARK T [CA]) [Y] 1 * figures 12,13,15 * * column 1, line 17 - line 29 * * column 4, line 24 - line 27 * * column 4, line 39 - line 43 * * column 4, line 60 - line 65 * * column 14, line 60 - column 15, line 27 * * column 17, line 31 - line 35 ** column 17, line 39 - line 43 *; | [Y]US5459318 (CACHO MIGUEL A [US], et al) [Y] 1,10 * figure 1 * * claims 1,12 * * column 1, line 24 - line 31 * * column 1, line 51 - line 53 * * column 1, line 61 - line 64 * * column 2, line 42 - line 49 * * column 6, line 3 - column 7, line 15 *; | [Y]US2009188642 (PITTMAN PAUL H [US], et al) [Y] 1,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] - [0005] - [0008] , [0009] , [0031] , [0033] , [0034] , [0039] , [0041] , [0042] , [0045] , [0047] * * figures 2,3,5,8,9,11 * * claims 1,2,6,7,12,13,18,20 *; | [Y]JP2015169569 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0012] , [0017] , [0026] - [0028] - [0034] - [0038] - [0047] , [0048] , [0055] * * figure 1 * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2015, no. 63, Database accession no. 2015-54072L, & WO2015133091 A1 20150911 (PANASONIC INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY MANAGEME) [ ] * abstract * | by applicant | WO9201540 | US2009188642 | JP2015169569 |