EP3217706 - SERVER AND BASE STATION OF A RADIO NETWORK, METHOD OF ACCESSING A RADIO NETWORK, AND NON-TRANSITORY COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industrial Technology Research Institute No. 195, Sec. 4 Chung Hsing Road Chutung Hsinchu 31040 / TW | [2017/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Chia-Lung 5F.-1, No. 57, Sanmin Rd. Zhubei City Hsinchu County 302 / TW | 02 /
Hsu, Fu-Te No. 7, Ln. 277, Sec. 1, Zhongshan S. Rd. Dayuan Dist. Taoyuan City 337 / TW | [2017/37] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/37] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16203997.8 | 14.12.2016 | [2017/37] | Priority number, date | US201662305539P | 09.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662305539 P | TW20160121179 | 05.07.2016 Original published format: TW 105121179 | [2017/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3217706 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/32, H04W24/02, // H04W88/08, H04W16/16 | [2017/37] | CPC: |
H04W16/32 (EP,US);
H04L41/0803 (CN);
H04L41/0806 (US);
H04L69/30 (CN);
H04W24/02 (EP,US);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04W16/16 (EP,US);
H04W84/045 (EP,US);
H04W88/085 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SERVER UND BASISSTATION EINES FUNKNETZES, VERFAHREN ZUM ZUGRIFF AUF EIN FUNKNETZ UND ÜBERGANGSLOSES COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM DAFÜR | [2017/37] | English: | SERVER AND BASE STATION OF A RADIO NETWORK, METHOD OF ACCESSING A RADIO NETWORK, AND NON-TRANSITORY COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM THEREOF | [2017/37] | French: | SERVEUR ET STATION DE BASE D'UN RÉSEAU RADIO, PROCÉDÉ D'ACCÈS À UN RÉSEAU RADIO, ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR NON TRANSITOIRE | [2017/37] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/37] | 14.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2014046581 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 5,21 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] ** claim 1 *; | [XYI]US2014335859 (HAHN GENEBECK [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,12-16,19,20,23,24,27 * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0076] * [Y] 5,21 [I] 11,17,18,22,25,26,28 |