EP3222886 - AXLE ASSEMBLY HAVING A LUBRICANT RESERVOIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArvinMeritor Technology, LLC 2135 West Maple Road Troy, MI 48084 / US | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYES, Brian 191 Jefferson Road Newark, OH 43055 / US | 02 /
MARTIN, Robert 29 South 30th Street Newark, OH 43055 / US | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Ayre, Nicola Unity Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/39] | Jones, John Bryn Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16204028.1 | 14.12.2016 | [2017/39] | Priority number, date | US201615077970 | 23.03.2016 Original published format: US201615077970 | [2017/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3222886 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3222886 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/04 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
F16H57/045 (EP,US);
F16H57/0424 (EP,CN,US);
F16H48/08 (US);
F16H48/38 (CN);
F16H57/031 (CN);
F16H57/0423 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] |
Former [2017/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ACHSENANORDNUNG MIT SCHMIERMITTELRESERVOIR | [2017/39] | English: | AXLE ASSEMBLY HAVING A LUBRICANT RESERVOIR | [2017/39] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ESSIEU DOTÉ D'UN RÉSERVOIR DE LUBRIFIANT | [2017/39] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 08.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2016 | AL | 23.10.2019 | AT | 23.10.2019 | CY | 23.10.2019 | CZ | 23.10.2019 | DK | 23.10.2019 | EE | 23.10.2019 | ES | 23.10.2019 | FI | 23.10.2019 | HR | 23.10.2019 | IT | 23.10.2019 | LT | 23.10.2019 | LV | 23.10.2019 | MC | 23.10.2019 | MK | 23.10.2019 | MT | 23.10.2019 | NL | 23.10.2019 | PL | 23.10.2019 | RO | 23.10.2019 | RS | 23.10.2019 | SI | 23.10.2019 | SK | 23.10.2019 | SM | 23.10.2019 | TR | 23.10.2019 | IE | 14.12.2019 | LU | 14.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | BG | 23.01.2020 | NO | 23.01.2020 | GR | 24.01.2020 | IS | 23.02.2020 | PT | 24.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 14.12.2016 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
TR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 14.12.2019 | ||
LU | 14.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 14.12.2016 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 14.12.2019 | ||
LU | 14.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.12.2016 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 14.12.2019 | ||
LU | 14.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 14.12.2019 | ||
LU | 14.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 14.12.2019 | ||
LU | 14.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
IE | 14.12.2019 | ||
LU | 14.12.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 23.10.2019 | |
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 23.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2008089040 (JTEKT CORP) [A] 1,15 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP2551554 (ARVINMERITOR TECHNOLOGY LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 4,5,8 *; | [A]US2015354691 (KEENEY CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0050]; figures 2,8 *; | [AP]US2016290484 (LENCZEWSKI ADRIAN M [US], et al) [AP] 1* figure 3 * | by applicant | US2014243137 |