EP3185327 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING DISPLAY APPARATUS AND DISPLAY APPARATUS MANUFACTURED USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2017/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Changhan c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City 17113 Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 02 /
PARK, Yongjun c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City 17113 Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 03 /
SHIM, Changwoo c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City 17113 Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 04 /
LEE, Sanghun c/o Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City 17113 Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2017/26] | Application number, filing date | 16204523.1 | 15.12.2016 | [2017/26] | Priority number, date | KR20150184079 | 22.12.2015 Original published format: KR 20150184079 | [2017/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3185327 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/52, H01L27/32 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
H10K59/873 (EP,CN);
H01L21/7688 (US);
H01L21/0272 (US);
H01L21/32135 (US);
H10K50/84 (US);
H10K50/8426 (US);
H10K50/844 (US);
H10K59/12 (US);
H10K59/122 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2017/26] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING DISPLAY APPARATUS AND DISPLAY APPARATUS MANUFACTURED USING THE SAME | [2017/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN AFFICHEUR ET AFFICHEUR FABRIQUÉ SELON LE PROCÉDÉ | [2017/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/26] | 06.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2012208306 (HAAS DIETER [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,10,12-15 * paragraphs [0050] - [0057]; figures 7a-d * [A] 8,9 [Y] 4,11; | [X]US2015001497 (JUNG SANG CHUL [KR], et al) [X] 1,5,7,14 * paragraphs [0029] - [0055]; figures 3a-h *; | [Y]WO2015008642 (SHARP KK [JP]) [Y] 4,11 * abstract *; | [P]US2016164030 (YASUDA YUKI [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0126] - [0153]; figure 9 * |