EP3196090 - WIRE ROPE COMPRISING A SUPPLY LINE, IN PARTICULAR A SERVICE ROPE FOR A FUNICULAR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fatzer AG Drahtseilfabrik Hofstrasse 44 8590 Romanshorn / CH | [2017/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIERI, Philippe Sonnhalde 4 8588 Zihlschlacht TG / CH | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Luchs, Willi Luchs & Partner AG Patentanwälte Schulhausstrasse 12 8002 Zürich / CH | [2017/30] | Application number, filing date | 16204648.6 | 16.12.2016 | [2017/30] | Priority number, date | deleted | [2018/13] |
Former [2017/30] | CH20160000102 | 22.01.2016 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3196090 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B61B12/00, D07B1/14, D07B1/16 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
D07B1/147 (EP);
D07B1/148 (EP);
D07B1/167 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTSEIL MIT EINER VERSORGUNGSLEITUNG, INSBESONDERE EIN VERSORGUNGSSEIL FÜR EINE SEILBAHNANLAGE | [2017/30] | English: | WIRE ROPE COMPRISING A SUPPLY LINE, IN PARTICULAR A SERVICE ROPE FOR A FUNICULAR ASSEMBLY | [2017/30] | French: | CÂBLE D'ACIER AVEC UN CIRCUIT D'ALIMENTATION, EN PARTICULIER CÂBLE D'ALIMENTATION POUR REMONTÉES MÉCANIQUES | [2017/30] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2017 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 30.10.2017 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 27.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/30] | 07.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3482034 (RHOADES LEE A, et al) [X] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 48 - line 61; figure 2 * * column 4, line 59 - line 69; figure 9 *; | [XY]JPS6025798U (.) [X] 1-4 * page 995, paragraph l; figures 4-6 * [Y] 7,12-14; | [X]JP2006322126 (TOKYO SEIKO SENI ROPE KK, et al) [X] 1,9 * abstract *; | [XY]GB2175323 (ACCO BABCOCK INC) [X] 1,3,4,10,11 * page 2, column r, line 84 - line 118; figures 6,7 * [Y] 5,6,8; | [Y]US5669214 (KOPANAKIS GEORG A [DE]) [Y] 5,6 * figures 6,7 *; | [Y]JPH0510494U (.) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0001]; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP2034089 (FATZER AG DRAHTSEILWERK [CH]) [Y] 8 * paragraphs [0043] , [0047]; figures 6,7 *; | [Y]DE202015002585U (BRUGG AG KABELWERKE [CH]) [Y] 12-14 * paragraphs [0053] , [0054] , [0055] , [0059] , [0060] , [0061] , [0064]; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]EP1881509 (POMAGALSKI SA [FR]) [A] 12-14 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0015] , [0018]; figures 1,3,4 * |