EP3169000 - METHODS AND ARRANGEMENTS FOR CSI REPORTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2017/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGMAN, Svante Selmedalsringen 8 SE-129 36 HÄGERSTEN / SE | 02 /
HAMMARWALL, David Hällmarksvägen 59 SE-186 53 VALLENTUNA / SE | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2017/20] | Application number, filing date | 16205352.4 | 07.05.2013 | [2017/20] | Priority number, date | US201213469843 | 11.05.2012 Original published format: US201213469843 | [2017/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3169000 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3169000 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0456, H04B7/06, H04L5/00, H04L1/00, H04L25/02, H04L25/03, // H04W52/16, H04W52/32, H04W24/10 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
H04B7/0456 (EP,CN,US);
H04B17/00 (KR);
H04B7/0626 (US);
H04B1/7115 (KR);
H04B7/0617 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/0619 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/063 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/0639 (EP,CN,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,CN,US);
H04L25/0224 (EP,CN,US);
H04L25/03949 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/00 (KR);
H04L5/0035 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/005 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0057 (EP,CN,US);
H04W24/02 (US);
H04W24/10 (RU,US);
H04L5/0026 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] |
Former [2017/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNGEN FÜR CSI-RÜCKMELDUNG | [2017/20] | English: | METHODS AND ARRANGEMENTS FOR CSI REPORTING | [2017/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RAPPORTS CSI | [2017/20] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2017 | Examination requested [2017/52] | 03.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13725837.2 / EP2847878 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.09.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 17.09.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |