EP3339588 - AN IMPROVED SELECTIVE CATALYTIC REDUCTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Perkins Engines Company Limited Eastfield Peterborough PE1 5NA / GB | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDEN, Alexis Flat 5, Bridge Court, Bridge Street Thrapston NN14 4JW / GB | 02 /
SHEAD, Leo 1 Templeman Drive, Carlby Stamford PE9 4NQ / GB | 03 /
SILVER, Ronald 5631 North Prospect Road Peoria, IL 61614 / US | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2018/26] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 16205947.1 | 21.12.2016 | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3339588 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3339588 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20, F01N9/00, F01N11/00 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP);
F01N3/035 (EP,US);
F01N11/002 (EP,US);
F01N13/0093 (EP,US);
F01N13/0097 (EP,US);
F01N3/106 (EP,US);
F01N3/208 (EP,US);
F01N9/00 (EP);
F01N13/009 (EP);
F01N2240/40 (EP,US);
F01N2560/026 (EP,US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US);
F01N2610/14 (EP);
F01N2610/1453 (EP);
F01N2610/146 (EP,US);
F01N2900/0408 (EP,US);
F01N2900/0412 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1402 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1621 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1622 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] |
Former [2018/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERBESSERTEN SELEKTIVEN KATALYTISCHEN REDUKTION | [2018/26] | English: | AN IMPROVED SELECTIVE CATALYTIC REDUCTION SYSTEM | [2018/26] | French: | SYSTÈME AMÉLIORÉ DE RÉDUCTION CATALYTIQUE SÉLECTIVE | [2018/26] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2018 | Examination requested [2018/50] | 01.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2016 | AL | 03.03.2021 | AT | 03.03.2021 | CY | 03.03.2021 | CZ | 03.03.2021 | DK | 03.03.2021 | EE | 03.03.2021 | ES | 03.03.2021 | FI | 03.03.2021 | HR | 03.03.2021 | IT | 03.03.2021 | LT | 03.03.2021 | LV | 03.03.2021 | MC | 03.03.2021 | MK | 03.03.2021 | MT | 03.03.2021 | NL | 03.03.2021 | PL | 03.03.2021 | RO | 03.03.2021 | RS | 03.03.2021 | SE | 03.03.2021 | SI | 03.03.2021 | SK | 03.03.2021 | SM | 03.03.2021 | BG | 03.06.2021 | NO | 03.06.2021 | GR | 04.06.2021 | IS | 03.07.2021 | PT | 05.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 21.12.2016 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
MK | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 21.12.2016 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/28] | HU | 21.12.2016 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2008307967 (COATES JAMES MARTIN [GB], et al) [AD] 1-11 * abstract ** paragraphs [0001] - [0030] *; | [XA]US2010024393 (CHI JOHN N [US], et al) [X] 7,8,10,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] , [0021] , [0037] - [0039] - [0057] , [0060] , [0062] , [0064] , [0067] * * paragraphs [0071] - [0090] - [0105] - [0118] - [0121] - [0142] - [0165] - [0169]; claims 1-16 * [A] 1-6,9; | [A]EP3103978 (PERKINS ENGINES CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0012] * | Examination | US5849593 | EP2381077 | by applicant | US2008307967 |