EP3184330 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROTECTING ARTICULATED VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states P.E.I. Protezioni Elaborazioni Industriali S.r.l. Via Torretta, 32-32/2 40012 Calderara di Reno (Bologna) / IT | [2017/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUIDI, Luca Via del Navile 14 40131 Bologna / IT | 02 /
TABELLINI, Giorgio Via Mongardino, 5 40037 Sasso Marconi (Bologna) / IT | [2019/32] |
Former [2017/26] | 01 /
GUIDI, Luca Via Ferrarese, 156/10 40128 Bologna / IT | ||
02 /
TABELLINI, Giorgio Via Mongardino, 5 40037 Sasso Marconi (Bologna) / IT | Representative(s) | Milli, Simone Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2017/26] | Application number, filing date | 16206182.4 | 22.12.2016 | [2017/26] | Priority number, date | IT2015UB09591 | 22.12.2015 Original published format: IT UB20159591 | [2017/26] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3184330 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3184330 | Date: | 29.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60D5/00, B61D17/22, B62D47/02 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
B60D5/003 (EP);
B61D17/22 (EP);
B62D47/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] |
Former [2017/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHÜTZEN VON GELENKFAHRZEUGEN | [2017/26] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROTECTING ARTICULATED VEHICLES | [2017/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE PROTECTION DES VÉHICULES ARTICULÉS | [2019/30] |
Former [2017/26] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE PROTECTION DES VÉHICULES ARTICULÉS | Examination procedure | 22.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 08.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2016 | AL | 29.01.2020 | AT | 29.01.2020 | CY | 29.01.2020 | CZ | 29.01.2020 | DK | 29.01.2020 | EE | 29.01.2020 | ES | 29.01.2020 | FI | 29.01.2020 | HR | 29.01.2020 | LT | 29.01.2020 | LV | 29.01.2020 | MC | 29.01.2020 | MK | 29.01.2020 | MT | 29.01.2020 | NL | 29.01.2020 | RO | 29.01.2020 | RS | 29.01.2020 | SE | 29.01.2020 | SI | 29.01.2020 | SK | 29.01.2020 | SM | 29.01.2020 | BG | 29.04.2020 | NO | 29.04.2020 | GR | 30.04.2020 | IS | 29.05.2020 | PT | 21.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 22.12.2016 | |
AL | 29.01.2020 | ||
AT | 29.01.2020 | ||
CY | 29.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2020 | ||
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
MT | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 22.12.2016 | |
AT | 29.01.2020 | ||
CY | 29.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2020 | ||
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
MT | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 29.01.2020 | |
CZ | 29.01.2020 | ||
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 29.01.2020 | |
CZ | 29.01.2020 | ||
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 29.01.2020 | |
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 29.01.2020 | |
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 29.01.2020 | |
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 29.01.2020 | |
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
NO | 29.04.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE29509204U (HUEBNER GUMMI & KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [X] 1,3-11,13,14 * page 3, paragraph 6 - page 4, paragraph 3 ** figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP2149463 (PEI PROTEZIONI ELABORAZIONI [IT]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0016] , [0021] - [0028] - [0031] , [0040] , [0041] * * figures 1,5,6 * |