EP3338636 - AN APPARATUS AND ASSOCIATED METHOD FOR IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LT, NO | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2024/09] |
Former [2019/36] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2018/26] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Honkala, Mikko Muuralankumpu 6 B 02770 Espoo / FI | 02 /
Vetek, Akos Biologinkatu 6E 52 00790 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
Taipalus, Tapio Hiidenkiukaantie 3 F 55 00340 Helsinki / FI | 04 /
Lindholm, Harri Mäkipellontie 10 A 00320 Helsinki / FI | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Whiting, Gary, et al Venner Shipley LLP 5 Stirling House Stirling Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford GU2 7RF / GB | [2024/09] |
Former [2018/26] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16206200.4 | 22.12.2016 | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3338636 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3338636 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G16H50/20, G06V10/44, A61B6/00, A61B6/03, G06T11/00, G06V10/82, G06V10/764 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B5/7221 (US);
A61B5/7264 (US);
A61B6/5211 (EP);
G06T11/003 (US);
G06T11/006 (EP);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06V10/454 (EP,US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP);
A61B5/245 (US);
G06T2207/10081 (US);
G06T2207/10088 (US);
G06T2207/10104 (US);
G06T2207/10108 (US);
G06T2207/10116 (US);
G06T2207/10132 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/26] | A61B6/03, A61B6/00, G06K9/66, G06T11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] |
Former [2018/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN ZUR BILDGEBUNG | [2018/26] | English: | AN APPARATUS AND ASSOCIATED METHOD FOR IMAGING | [2018/26] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMAGERIE ASSOCIÉ | [2018/26] | Examination procedure | 24.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 24.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2019 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 11.11.2019 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 13.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2004022348 (HEUMANN JOHN M [US]) [X] 1,2,13-15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0026] , [0035] , [0036] * [A] 3-12; | [A]US2015196265 (SUZUKI KENJI [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2015201895 (SUZUKI KENJI [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |