EP3339275 - METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ETHYLENE AND ACETIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Klosterhofstraße 1 80331 München / DE | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zellhuber, Mathieu Bertha-von-Suttner-Weg 20 82152 Martinsried / DE | 02 /
Winkler, Florian Kyreinstr. 14 81371 München / DE | 03 /
Schubert, Martin Randeckstr. 4 81375 München / DE | 04 /
Andreas, Meiswinkel Hochfellnstr. 1 83253 Rimsting / DE | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | m patent group Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16206435.6 | 22.12.2016 | [2018/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3339275 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07C5/48, C07C51/215, C07C11/04, C07C53/08 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
C07C5/48 (EP,US);
C07C51/215 (EP,US);
C07C11/04 (US);
C07C53/08 (US)
| C-Set: |
C07C5/48, C07C11/04 (EP,US);
C07C51/215, C07C53/08 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ETHYLEN UND ESSIGSÄURE | [2018/26] | English: | METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ETHYLENE AND ACETIC ACID | [2018/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION D'ÉTHYLÈNE ET ACIDE ACÉTIQUE | [2018/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/25] | 04.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4899003 (MANYIK ROBERT M [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, lines 11-18 * * column 5, lines 33-34 * * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 26 ** examples 1-3 *; | [XI]EP1201630 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0019] , [0020] , [0040] * * Absatz [0101], Beispiel 2 * * Absatz [0102], Beispiele 3 und 4 * [I] 1-15 | by applicant | - "Light Alkanes Oxidation: Targets Reached and Current Challenges", IVARS, F; LOPEZ NIETO, J. M., Handbook of Advanced Methods and Processes in Oxidation Catalysis: From Laboratory to Industry, London, IMPERIAL COLLEGE PRESS, (2014), pages 767 - 834 | - GÄRTNER, C.A. ET AL., "Oxidative Dehydrogenation of Ethane: Common Principles and Mechanistic Aspects", CHEMCATCHEM, (2013), vol. 5, no. 11, pages 3196 - 3217 |