EP3185119 - JUDGMENT DEVICE, PROGRAM, JUDGMENT METHOD IN JUDGMENT DEVICE, AND PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 1-6, Shinjuku 4-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8801 / JP | [2017/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAYAMA, Noriaki c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome, Suwa-shi Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2017/26] | Application number, filing date | 16206697.1 | 23.12.2016 | [2017/26] | Priority number, date | JP20150253625 | 25.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015253625 | [2017/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3185119 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12, B41J3/36, B41J3/407, G06F1/26, // B41J29/393, G06F1/3212 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
G06F3/121 (EP,US);
B41J29/393 (EP,CN,US);
G01R31/3647 (US);
B41J2/0457 (US);
B41J23/00 (US);
B41J29/38 (EP,US);
B41J3/36 (EP,US);
B41J3/4075 (EP,US);
G01R31/367 (US);
G06F1/3212 (EP,US);
G06F1/329 (EP,US);
G06F3/1229 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/26] | G06F3/12, B41J3/36, B41J3/407, G06F1/26, // B41J29/393 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/07] |
Former [2017/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEURTEILUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BEURTEILUNGSVERFAHREN IN EINER BEURTEILUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND DRUCKER | [2017/26] | English: | JUDGMENT DEVICE, PROGRAM, JUDGMENT METHOD IN JUDGMENT DEVICE, AND PRINTER | [2017/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉVALUATION, PROGRAMME, PROCÉDÉ DE D'ÉVALUATION DANS UN DISPOSITIF D'ÉVALUATION ET IMPRIMANTE | [2017/26] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/07] | 25.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/41] | 27.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH10105295 (CANON KK) [X] 1,2,7-10,13-15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0016] * * paragraphs [0025] , [0034] - [0037] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0052] * * figures 7-9 * [I] 3-6,11,12; | [XI]US2002033872 (TAKAHASHI YASUO [JP]) [X] 1,7-9,13-15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0038] * * paragraphs [0053] - [0063] * * paragraphs [0083] - [0095] * * figures 1, 2A, 4, 6, 7 *[I] 2-6,10-12 | by applicant | JP2014188931 |