EP3187121 - HAND-HELD ELECTROMECHANICAL SURGICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2017/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRIBANIC, Russell 181 Bacon Road Roxbury, Connecticut 06783 / US | 02 /
BEARDSLEY, John 14 Killen Road Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 03 /
CHOWANIEC, Matthew 35 Blueberry Hill Drive Madison, Connecticut 06443 / US | 04 /
RINALDI, Paul 65 Woodwards Dr. Wolcott, Connecticut 06716 / US | [2023/30] |
Former [2017/27] | 01 /
PRIBANIC, Russell 181 Bacon Road Roxbury, CT Connecticut 06783 / US | ||
02 /
BEARDSLEY, John 14 Killen Road Wallingford, CT Connecticut 06492 / US | |||
03 /
CHOWANIEC, Matthew 35 Blueberry Hill Drive Madison, CT Connecticut 06443 / US | |||
04 /
RINALDI, Paul 65 Woodwards Dr. Wolcott, CT Connecticut 06716 / US | Representative(s) | Maschio & Soames IP Ltd 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/27] | Maschio, Antonio Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | Application number, filing date | 16206726.8 | 23.12.2016 | [2017/27] | Priority number, date | US201514983689 | 30.12.2015 Original published format: US201514983689 | [2017/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3187121 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3187121 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3187121 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072, A61B17/068, A61B17/16, A61B18/10, A61C1/00, // A61B50/30, A61B17/00, A61B50/00, A61B90/00, A61B17/29, A61B18/20, A61B46/10, A61F2/70 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/00 (KR,US);
A61B17/28 (US);
A61B17/02 (US);
A61B17/068 (US);
A61B17/10 (US);
A61B17/115 (US);
A61B17/32 (US);
A61B17/3201 (US);
A61B46/10 (EP,US);
A61B50/30 (EP,US);
A61B90/70 (US);
A61B17/1622 (EP,US);
A61B17/1628 (EP,US);
A61B17/2909 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00017 (KR,US);
A61B2017/00115 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00199 (US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00477 (CN,KR,US);
A61B2017/00526 (US);
A61B2017/00734 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00907 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2925 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2948 (EP,US);
A61B2050/0051 (EP,US);
A61B2050/0055 (EP,US);
A61B2050/0056 (EP,US);
A61B2050/0057 (EP,US);
A61B2050/0066 (EP,US);
A61B2050/0083 (EP,US);
A61B2050/3014 (EP,US);
A61B2090/081 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0813 (EP,US);
A61B2560/04 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2017/44] | A61B17/072, A61B17/068, A61B17/16, A61B18/10, A61C1/00, // A61B50/30, A61B17/00, A61B50/00, A61B90/00, A61B17/29, A61B18/20, A61F2/70 | ||
Former IPC [2017/27] | A61B17/068, A61B17/072, // A61B17/00, A61B50/00, A61B90/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] |
Former [2017/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TRAGBARES ELEKTROMECHANISCHES CHIRURGISCHES SYSTEM | [2017/27] | English: | HAND-HELD ELECTROMECHANICAL SURGICAL SYSTEM | [2017/27] | French: | SYSTÈME CHIRURGICAL ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE PORTATIF | [2017/27] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 21.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4091880 (TROUTNER VERNON H, et al) [I] 13* column 4, line 38 - line 52; figures 10, 11 *; | [XY]US2003149424 (BARLEV B ALEX [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-10 * [Y] 5-7,11,12; | [I]US2006217729 (ESKRIDGE DANA A [US], et al) [I] 13 * paragraphs [0037] , [0 83]; figures 2, 2A, 6, 9A *; | [XY]US2010000074 (SMITH KEVIN W [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10 * paragraph [0156] - paragraph [0159]; figures 17-22 * [Y] 5-7,11,12; | [XY]US2011125138 (MALINOUSKAS DONALD [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10 * paragraph [0150] - paragraph [0151]; figures 7, 8, 12 * [Y] 5-7,11,12; | [XI]US2013261643 (MEADE JOHN C [US], et al) [X] 13,14 * paragraphs [0088] - [0089] - [ 105]; figures 27-28 * [I] 15,16; | [I]US2014207124 (ALDRIDGE JEFFREY L [US], et al) [I] 13-16 * paragraphs [0063] - [0068]; figures 6-8; claim 21 *; | [I]WO2014144780 (TRAK SURGICAL INC [US]) [I] 13-16 * paragraphs [0713] , [ 717] , [ 1111] , [ 1120] , [ 1121]; figures 192-194 * | Examination | WO2007089603 | US2016022374 | by applicant | US2016095585 |