EP3339524 - A BUILDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CDM N.V. Reutenbeek 9 3090 Overijse / BE | [2021/25] |
Former [2018/26] | For all designated states WETENSCHAPPELIJK EN TECHNISCH CENTRUM VOOR HET BOUWBEDRIJF in het verkort: WTCB Lombardstraat 42 1000 Brussel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Venstermans, Jan Hazelaarshof 4 2560 Nijlen / BE | 02 /
Ingelaere, Bart Rue de Limauges 42 1490 Court St.-Etienne / BE | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Callewaert, Raf Bureau Callewaert Brusselsesteenweg 108 3090 Overijse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 16206820.9 | 23.12.2016 | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3339524 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/10, E04B1/82, // F16B5/02 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
E04B1/10 (EP);
E04B1/82 (EP);
E04B2001/8254 (EP);
F16B5/0241 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] |
Former [2018/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEBÄUDE | [2018/26] | English: | A BUILDING | [2018/26] | French: | BÂTIMENT | [2018/26] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 19.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/42] | 18.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/42] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.02.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 08.02.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.02.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0159228 (VETENSKAPSSTADEN [SE], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 5, line 27 - page 12, line 11; figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE202014100979U (BSW BERLEBURGER SCHAUMSTOFFWERK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,13,14* the whole document * | by applicant | EP2687651 | US2015198188 |